This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/23/2023 at 06:34:30 (UTC).

ARTURO RAMIREZ, ET AL. VS AUTOZONE WEST, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/27/2023 ARTURO RAMIREZ, filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against AUTOZONE WEST, LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9469

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RAMIREZ ARTURO

RUVALCABA MARIA LUISA RUIZ

Defendants

AUTOZONE WEST LLC

BOSCH AUTOMOTIVE SERVICE SOLUTIONS LLC

BWDAC INC.

DCO LLC

EPE INC.

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

GENUINE PARTS COMPANY DBA NATIONAL AUTOMOTIVE PARTS ASSOCIATION AKA NAPA

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. FKA ALLIEDSIGNAL INC.

LUK CLUTCH SYSTEMS LLC

MACK TRUCKS INC.

MORSE TEC LLC FKA BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC

PACCAR INC.

PARAMOUNT GLOBAL FKA VIACOMCBS INC. FKA CBS CORPORATION A DELAWARE CORPORATION FKA VIACOM INC. SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION FKA WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION

PEP BOYS MANNY MOE & JACK OF CALIFORNIA LLC FKA THE PEP BOYS-MANNY MOE & JACK OF CALIFORNIA

PNEUMO ABEX LLC

ROBERT BOSCH LLC

SOCO-LYNCH CORPORATION

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

OXLEY HANNAH B.

PEARCE TIMOTHY FRANCIS

FUCHS ANYA

LEWIS STUART B.

Defendant Attorneys

BOWLBY STEPHANIE L.

KHARE VIIU SPANGLER

MUSE ANGELA

TAVERA LEONARD

DUBOIS JACQUELINE K.

LASHINSKY NATALIE GARCIA

BUTY MADELINE L.

CALFO PAUL ANGELO

LODMER ZACHARY HARRIS

 

Court Documents

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES

8/8/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES

Demand for Jury Trial

8/8/2023: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer - AUTOZONE WEST, LLCS ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES ASBESTOS-PERSONAL INJURY

8/8/2023: Answer - AUTOZONE WEST, LLCS ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES ASBESTOS-PERSONAL INJURY

Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY STANDARD MOTOR PRODUCTS, INC. AND PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION, AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO THE EIS AUTOMOTIVE CORPORATION

6/6/2023: Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY STANDARD MOTOR PRODUCTS, INC. AND PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION, AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO THE EIS AUTOMOTIVE CORPORATION

Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

6/6/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Answer - DEFENDANT PNEUMO ABEX LLCS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (ASBESTOS-PERSONAL INJURY); REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL

6/1/2023: Answer - DEFENDANT PNEUMO ABEX LLCS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (ASBESTOS-PERSONAL INJURY); REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL

Answer - DEFENDANT MORSE TEC LLC, F/K/A BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC, AS SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO BORG-WARNER CORPORATIONS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY AND LOSS OF CONSORTIUM; DEMAND

6/1/2023: Answer - DEFENDANT MORSE TEC LLC, F/K/A BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC, AS SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO BORG-WARNER CORPORATIONS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY AND LOSS OF CONSORTIUM; DEMAND

Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

6/1/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Answer - ANSWER OF DEFENDANT BWDAC, INC. TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (ASBESTOS- PERSONAL INJURY); REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL

6/1/2023: Answer - ANSWER OF DEFENDANT BWDAC, INC. TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (ASBESTOS- PERSONAL INJURY); REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL

Answer - DEFENDANT EPE, INC.S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES AND LOSS OF CONSORTIUM- ASBESTOS

6/1/2023: Answer - DEFENDANT EPE, INC.S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES AND LOSS OF CONSORTIUM- ASBESTOS

Answer

5/31/2023: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial - DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND ESTIMATE OF LENGTH OF TRIAL

5/31/2023: Demand for Jury Trial - DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND ESTIMATE OF LENGTH OF TRIAL

Answer

5/31/2023: Answer

Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT GENUINE PARTS COMPANYS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY-ASBESTOS

5/31/2023: Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT GENUINE PARTS COMPANYS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY-ASBESTOS

Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., F/K/A ALLIEDSIGNAL INC., SUCCESSOR-IN- INTEREST TO THE BENDIX CORPORATIONS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR PERSONAL INJURY

5/22/2023: Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., F/K/A ALLIEDSIGNAL INC., SUCCESSOR-IN- INTEREST TO THE BENDIX CORPORATIONS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR PERSONAL INJURY

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

5/16/2023: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF DEATH

5/16/2023: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF DEATH

Answer - ANSWER PACCAR INCS ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

5/16/2023: Answer - ANSWER PACCAR INCS ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2024
  • Hearing03/06/2024 at 1:45 PM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Status Conference re: Group (Pearce Lewis, LLP))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2023
  • DocketAutozone West, LLCs Answer to Complaint for Damages Asbestos-Personal Injury; Filed by: AutoZone West, LLC (Defendant); As to: Arturo Ramirez (Plaintiff); Maria Luisa Ruiz Ruvalcaba (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2023
  • DocketNotice of Deposit of Jury Fees; Filed by: AutoZone West, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2023
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: AutoZone West, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearance; Filed by: Parker Hannifin Corporation (Defendant); Standard Motor Products, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Arturo Ramirez (Plaintiff); Maria Luisa Ruiz Ruvalcaba (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint by Standard Motor Products, Inc. and Parker-Hannifin Corporation, as Successor in Interest to The EIS Automotive Corporation; Filed by: Parker Hannifin Corporation (Defendant); Standard Motor Products, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Arturo Ramirez (Plaintiff); Maria Luisa Ruiz Ruvalcaba (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketDefendant Pneumo Abex LLCs Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint for Damages (Asbestos-Personal Injury); Request for Jury Trial; Filed by: Pneumo Abex, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearance; Filed by: Pneumo Abex, LLC (Defendant); As to: Pneumo Abex, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketAnswer of Defendant BWDAC, Inc. to Plaintiffs Complaint for Damages (Asbestos- Personal Injury); Request for Jury Trial; Filed by: BWDAC, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Deemed Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: JCCP Coordinated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Laura A. Seigle in Department 15 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Asbestos

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Arturo Ramirez (Plaintiff); Maria Luisa Ruiz Ruvalcaba (Plaintiff); As to: AutoZone West, LLC (Defendant); Bosch Automotive Service Solutions, LLC (Defendant); BWDAC, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • DocketNotice Preliminary Fact Sheet; Filed by: Arturo Ramirez (Plaintiff); Maria Luisa Ruiz Ruvalcaba (Plaintiff); As to: AutoZone West, LLC (Defendant); Bosch Automotive Service Solutions, LLC (Defendant); BWDAC, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Arturo Ramirez (Plaintiff); Maria Luisa Ruiz Ruvalcaba (Plaintiff); As to: AutoZone West, LLC (Defendant); Bosch Automotive Service Solutions, LLC (Defendant); BWDAC, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Arturo Ramirez (Plaintiff); Maria Luisa Ruiz Ruvalcaba (Plaintiff); As to: AutoZone West, LLC (Defendant); Bosch Automotive Service Solutions, LLC (Defendant); BWDAC, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less