This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/29/2023 at 18:41:14 (UTC).

STEWART TITLE GUARANTY COMPANY VS GIRL EMPOWERMENT, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/01/2023 STEWART TITLE GUARANTY COMPANY filed an Other lawsuit against GIRL EMPOWERMENT, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8144

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STEWART TITLE GUARANTY COMPANY

Defendant

GIRL EMPOWERMENT LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GIZER SCOTT E.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/1/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/1/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Summons on Complaint

8/1/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/1/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

8/1/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

8/1/2023: First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

8/1/2023: Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/9/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

8/11/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/11/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice (name extension) Notice of Case Management Conference

8/16/2023: Notice (name extension) Notice of Case Management Conference

Order (name extension) Order GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

11/22/2023: Order (name extension) Order GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

Stipulation and Order (name extension) Stipulation and Order STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

11/22/2023: Stipulation and Order (name extension) Stipulation and Order STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

01/19/2024

Hearing01/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2024

Hearing01/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2023

DocketUpdated -- Order GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT: Status Date changed from 11/22/2023 to 11/22/2023 ; Name Extension changed from PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT to GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT ; Result Date changed from 11/22/2023 to 11/22/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2023

DocketStipulation and Order STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; Filed by: Stewart Title Guaranty Company (Plaintiff); Girl Empowerment, LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2023

DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT: Filed By: Girl Empowerment, LLC (Defendant),Stewart Title Guaranty Company (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 11/22/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2023

DocketOrder PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; Signed and Filed by: Stewart Title Guaranty Company (Plaintiff); Girl Empowerment, LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2023

DocketUpdated -- Order PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT: Filed By: Girl Empowerment, LLC (Defendant),Stewart Title Guaranty Company (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 11/22/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2023

DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 01/19/2024 08:30 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2023

DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 01/19/2024 08:30 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Stewart Title Guaranty Company (Plaintiff); As to: Stewart Title Guaranty Company (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
08/04/2023

DocketAddress for Scott E. Gizer (Attorney) updated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023

DocketUpdated -- Scott E. Gizer (Attorney): Middle Name: E.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Stewart Title Guaranty Company (Plaintiff); As to: Girl Empowerment, LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Stewart Title Guaranty Company (Plaintiff); As to: Girl Empowerment, LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Stewart Title Guaranty Company (Plaintiff); As to: Girl Empowerment, LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elaine Lu in Department 26 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less