This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/26/2023 at 03:05:45 (UTC).

MUIR-CHASE PLUMBING CO., INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS HOWARD BUILDING CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/26/2023 MUIR-CHASE PLUMBING CO , INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against HOWARD BUILDING CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT, ELAINE LU, HOLLY J. FUJIE and DOUGLAS W. STERN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2014

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT

ELAINE LU

HOLLY J. FUJIE

DOUGLAS W. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MUIR-CHASE PLUMBING CO. INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

BROOKFIELD DTLA HOLDINGS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AKA BROOKFIELD DTLA HOLDINGS 777 TOWER LLC

HOWARD BUILDING CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

MAGUIRE PROPERTIES - 777 TOWER LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUDMAN BRUCE D.

Defendant Attorneys

TATE THERESA CRAWFORD

SEUYLEMEZIAN MICHAEL BRIAN

 

Court Documents

Stipulation (name extension) - No Order Stipulation - No Order STIPULATION OF PLAINTIFF MUIRCHASE PLUMBING CO., INC AND DEFENDANT BROOKFIELD DTLA HOLDINGS, LLC

10/31/2023: Stipulation (name extension) - No Order Stipulation - No Order STIPULATION OF PLAINTIFF MUIRCHASE PLUMBING CO., INC AND DEFENDANT BROOKFIELD DTLA HOLDINGS, LLC

Request for Dismissal

10/31/2023: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)

10/17/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)

Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 10/17/2023

10/17/2023: Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 10/17/2023

Minute Order Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Jury Fee Deposit)

9/28/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Jury Fee Deposit)

Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Jury Fee Deposit) of 09/28/2023

9/28/2023: Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Jury Fee Deposit) of 09/28/2023

Notice of Lodging (name extension) Notice of Lodging JURY FEES

9/27/2023: Notice of Lodging (name extension) Notice of Lodging JURY FEES

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/27/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

9/19/2023: Case Management Statement

Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order)

9/18/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order)

Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 09/18/2023

9/18/2023: Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 09/18/2023

Case Management Statement

9/11/2023: Case Management Statement

Answer

9/5/2023: Answer

Declaration of Demurring Party in Support of Automatic Extension

8/10/2023: Declaration of Demurring Party in Support of Automatic Extension

Declaration of Demurring Party in Support of Automatic Extension

8/10/2023: Declaration of Demurring Party in Support of Automatic Extension

Notice (name extension) Notice of Case Management Conference

8/9/2023: Notice (name extension) Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/4/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order Re CCP 170.6 Reassignment with Related Cases)

7/28/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order Re CCP 170.6 Reassignment with Related Cases)

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/18/2024

Hearing11/18/2024 at 09:30 AM in Department 56 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/05/2024

Hearing11/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 56 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2023

DocketStipulation - No Order STIPULATION OF PLAINTIFF MUIRCHASE PLUMBING CO., INC AND DEFENDANT BROOKFIELD DTLA HOLDINGS, LLC; Filed by: MAGUIRE PROPERTIES - 777 TOWER, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant); BROOKFIELD DTLA HOLDINGS, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant); As to: MUIR-CHASE PLUMBING CO., INC, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2023

DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: MUIR-CHASE PLUMBING CO., INC, a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: MUIR-CHASE PLUMBING CO., INC, a California corporation (Plaintiff); HOWARD BUILDING CORPORATION, a California corporation (Defendant); MAGUIRE PROPERTIES - 777 TOWER, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2023

DocketOn the Complaint filed by MUIR-CHASE PLUMBING CO., INC, a California corporation on 05/26/2023, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by MUIR-CHASE PLUMBING CO., INC, a California corporation as to BROOKFIELD DTLA HOLDINGS, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Payment of Waived Fees; by:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2023

DocketNon-Appearance Case Review re: Dismissal of Defendant Brookfield DTLA Holdings scheduled for 11/02/2023 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 56 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/31/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2023

DocketERROR with ROA message definition 129 with DismissalParty:3167445 resulted in empty message

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2023

DocketNon-Appearance Case Review re: Dismissal of Defendant Brookfield DTLA Holdings scheduled for 11/02/2023 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 56

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2023

DocketMinute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
57 More Docket Entries
06/01/2023

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 08/29/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 54

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: MUIR-CHASE PLUMBING CO., INC, a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: HOWARD BUILDING CORPORATION, a California corporation (Defendant); MAGUIRE PROPERTIES - 777 TOWER, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant); BROOKFIELD DTLA HOLDINGS, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: MUIR-CHASE PLUMBING CO., INC, a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: HOWARD BUILDING CORPORATION, a California corporation (Defendant); MAGUIRE PROPERTIES - 777 TOWER, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant); BROOKFIELD DTLA HOLDINGS, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: MUIR-CHASE PLUMBING CO., INC, a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: HOWARD BUILDING CORPORATION, a California corporation (Defendant); MAGUIRE PROPERTIES - 777 TOWER, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant); BROOKFIELD DTLA HOLDINGS, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maurice A. Leiter in Department 54 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less