This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/15/2023 at 03:34:43 (UTC).

SAMUEL LUNA, ET AL. VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/03/2023 SAMUEL LUNA, filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7166

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LUNA SAMUEL

ROBINSON BROOKE

MENTON MELISSA [GAL FOR GRAYDON PHELPS]

MEADE KEANU

Defendants

EDISON INTERNATIONAL

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEVITT JAMES

Defendant Attorney

HUESTON JOHN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order Minute Order (Further Status Conference [20STCV10176]; Further Status Confe...)

10/3/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Further Status Conference [20STCV10176]; Further Status Confe...)

Stipulation and Order (name extension) Stipulation and Order for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint

9/27/2023: Stipulation and Order (name extension) Stipulation and Order for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint Second Amended Complaint for

9/27/2023: Amended Complaint Second Amended Complaint for

Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing (Stipulation And [Proposed] Order For Leave To File Second Amended Complaint)

9/26/2023: Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing (Stipulation And [Proposed] Order For Leave To File Second Amended Complaint)

Minute Order Minute Order (Further Status Conference)

8/22/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Further Status Conference)

Stipulation and Order (name extension) Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order for Amendment to Complaint Haying Reached Age of Majority and Discharge of Guardian Ad Litem, Declaration of James Devitt

8/10/2023: Stipulation and Order (name extension) Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order for Amendment to Complaint Haying Reached Age of Majority and Discharge of Guardian Ad Litem, Declaration of James Devitt

Notice Re: Add-On Petition (name extension) Notice of Court Order Re: Petition for Coordination of Add-On Case

7/3/2023: Notice Re: Add-On Petition (name extension) Notice of Court Order Re: Petition for Coordination of Add-On Case

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (Graydon Phelps)

6/29/2023: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (Graydon Phelps)

Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order)

6/26/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

6/26/2023: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

6/26/2023: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order)

6/26/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order)

Order (name extension) Order Re: Petition for Coordination of Add-On Case

6/23/2023: Order (name extension) Order Re: Petition for Coordination of Add-On Case

Amended Complaint First Amended Complaint

6/16/2023: Amended Complaint First Amended Complaint

Notice Re: Add-On Petition (name extension) Notice of Submission re: Southern California Edison Company and Edison International’s Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case

6/12/2023: Notice Re: Add-On Petition (name extension) Notice of Submission re: Southern California Edison Company and Edison International’s Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Re: Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case

6/6/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Re: Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case

Declaration (name extension) Declaration of Craig A. Fligor in Support of Southern California Edison Company and Edison International's Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case

6/6/2023: Declaration (name extension) Declaration of Craig A. Fligor in Support of Southern California Edison Company and Edison International's Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case

Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case (JCCP)

6/6/2023: Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case (JCCP)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/23/2023

DocketMinute Order (Further Status Conference [20STCV10176]; Further Status Confe...)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2023

DocketUpdated -- Minute Order (Further Status Conference [20STCV10176]; Further Status Confe...): Status Date changed from 10/23/2023 to 10/23/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023

DocketUpdated -- Second Amended Complaint for: Name Extension: (2nd)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023

DocketSecond Amended Complaint for; Filed by: Samuel Luna (Plaintiff); Brooke Robinson (Plaintiff); Graydon Phelps, (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023

DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint: Status Date changed from 09/27/2023 to 09/27/2023 ; Exact Name changed from Stipulation and [Proposed] Order for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint to Stipulation and Order for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint ; Result Date changed from 09/27/2023 to 09/27/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023

DocketUpdated -- James Devitt (Attorney): First Name changed from Jay to James

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023

DocketStipulation and [Proposed] Order for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint; Signed and Filed by: Samuel Luna (Plaintiff); Brooke Robinson (Plaintiff); Graydon Phelps, (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023

DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and [Proposed] Order for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint: Filed By: Graydon Phelps, (Plaintiff),Samuel Luna (Plaintiff),Brooke Robinson (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 09/27/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023

DocketUpdated -- Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing (Stipulation And [Proposed] Order For Leave To File Second Amended Complaint): Name Extension: (Stipulation And [Proposed] Order For Leave To File Second Amended Complaint) ; Status changed from Rejected to Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023

DocketUpdated -- Graydon Phelps, (Plaintiff): Last Name changed from Phelps to Phelps,

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
26 More Docket Entries
04/11/2023

DocketUpdated -- Melissa Mentone, [GAL for Graydon Phelps] (Plaintiff): Name Suffix: [GAL for Graydon Phelps]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2023

DocketCase reassigned to Spring Street Courthouse in Department 10 - Hon. William F. Highberger; Reason: Deemed Complex (Non-Class Action)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2023

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Deemed Complex

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2023

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Stay - Deemed Complex

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Samuel Luna (Plaintiff); Brooke Robinson (Plaintiff); Melissa Mentone (Plaintiff); Graydon Phelps (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2023

DocketCase assigned in Department 11 Spring Street Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2023

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2023

DocketUpdated -- Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing (Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem): Name Extension: (Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem) ; As To Parties: ; Status changed from Rejected to Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Samuel Luna (Plaintiff); Brooke Robinson (Plaintiff); Melissa Mentone (Plaintiff); Graydon Phelps (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Samuel Luna (Plaintiff); Brooke Robinson (Plaintiff); Melissa Mentone (Plaintiff); Graydon Phelps (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less