This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/05/2023 at 08:56:45 (UTC).

THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, ACTING BY AND THROUGH THE DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION VS BLUE WOLVERINES, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/15/2023 THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, ACTING BY AND THROUGH THE DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against BLUE WOLVERINES, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT B. BROADBELT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3914

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROBERT B. BROADBELT

 

Party Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff

THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ACTING BY AND THROUGH THE DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

BLUE WOLVERINES LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

CALIFORNIA WATER SERVICE GROUP A DELAWARE CORPORATION SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO DOMINGUEZ WATER CORPORATION

CDC SMALL BUSINESS FINANCE CORP. AKA CDC SMALL BUSINESS FINANCE

COUNTY SANITATION DISTRICT NO. 2

ENTERPRISE BANK & TRUST SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO FIRST CHOICE BANK

GORDON SAND COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

LANDMARK INFRASTRUCTURE HOLDING COMPANY LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

LD ACQUISITION COMPANY 12 LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

NUCKLES OIL COMPANY INC.

PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY A CORPORATION DBA AT&T CALIFORNIA AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO THE PACIFIC TELEPHONE AND TELEGRAPH COMPANY

REGENCY OUTDOOR ADVERTISING INC.

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

TICOR TITLE COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA

UMPQUA BANK AN OREGON STATE-CHARTERED BANK

UNITED STATES SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION

VAN DYK TANK LINES INC

LMRK PROPCO LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

KBS HOLDCO LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA REGENCY OUTDOOR ADVERTISINC INC.

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHOI DEPUTY ATTORNEY DANIEL

Defendant Attorneys

BEVERLIN WESLEY G.

JONES ANDREW M.

YANG JASMIN

HUTCHINSON SUSAN M.

KUHN BRADFORD B.

PIERCE BRADLEY DONALD

 

Court Documents

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

12/1/2023: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Notice of Ruling

11/29/2023: Notice of Ruling

Ex Parte Proposed Order

11/27/2023: Ex Parte Proposed Order

Minute Order Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For An Order Advancing The He...)

11/27/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For An Order Advancing The He...)

Ex Parte Application (name extension) Ex Parte Application Ex Parte Application For An Order Advancing The Hearing Date On The State's Motion For Order Of Possession Memorandum Of Points And Authorities Declaration Of Daniel Choi

11/22/2023: Ex Parte Application (name extension) Ex Parte Application Ex Parte Application For An Order Advancing The Hearing Date On The State's Motion For Order Of Possession Memorandum Of Points And Authorities Declaration Of Daniel Choi

Answer

11/13/2023: Answer

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

11/1/2023: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Notice (name extension) Notice Plaintiffs Notice Of Withdrawal Of Request For Entry Of Default Of Defendant Regency Outdoor Advertising, Inc.

10/25/2023: Notice (name extension) Notice Plaintiffs Notice Of Withdrawal Of Request For Entry Of Default Of Defendant Regency Outdoor Advertising, Inc.

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/20/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Disclaimer

10/19/2023: Disclaimer

Minute Order Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

10/16/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

Answer

10/13/2023: Answer

Cross-Complaint

10/13/2023: Cross-Complaint

Case Management Statement

10/12/2023: Case Management Statement

Joint Status Conference Report

10/11/2023: Joint Status Conference Report

Disclaimer

10/11/2023: Disclaimer

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

10/10/2023: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Proof of Personal Service

10/3/2023: Proof of Personal Service

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

01/23/2024

Hearing01/23/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 53 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2024

Hearing01/12/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 53 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Order of Possession

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/01/2023

DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, acting by and through the Department of Transportation (Plaintiff); As to: KBS Holdco, LLC, a California limited liability company, dba Regency Outdoor Advertisinc, Inc. (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2023

DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, acting by and through the Department of Transportation (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/27/2023

DocketUpdated -- Ex Parte Application Ex Parte Application For An Order Advancing The Hearing Date On The State's Motion For Order Of Possession Memorandum Of Points And Authorities Declaration Of Daniel Choi: Filed By: THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, acting by and through the Department of Transportation (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 11/27/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/27/2023

DocketEx Parte Proposed Order; Signed and Filed by: THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, acting by and through the Department of Transportation (Plaintiff); As to: BLUE WOLVERINES, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/27/2023

DocketHearing on Motion for Order of Possession scheduled for 01/12/2024 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 53

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/27/2023

DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For An Order Advancing The He...)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/27/2023

DocketHearing on Ex Parte Application For An Order Advancing The Hearing Date On The State's Motion For Order Of Possession scheduled for 11/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 53 updated: Result Date to 11/27/2023; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/27/2023

DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion for Order of Possession scheduled for 06/06/2024 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 53 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 01/12/2024 10:00 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
50 More Docket Entries
06/16/2023

DocketAddress for Daniel Choi, Deputy Attorney (Attorney) updated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 10/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 53

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, acting by and through the Department of Transportation (Plaintiff); As to: BLUE WOLVERINES, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); COUNTY SANITATION DISTRICT NO. 2 (Defendant); CALIFORNIA WATER SERVICE GROUP, a Delaware corporation, successor in interest to Dominguez Water Corporation (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2023

DocketNotice NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF PROCEEDING; Filed by: THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, acting by and through the Department of Transportation (Plaintiff); As to: BLUE WOLVERINES, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); COUNTY SANITATION DISTRICT NO. 2 (Defendant); CALIFORNIA WATER SERVICE GROUP, a Delaware corporation, successor in interest to Dominguez Water Corporation (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, acting by and through the Department of Transportation (Plaintiff); As to: BLUE WOLVERINES, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); COUNTY SANITATION DISTRICT NO. 2 (Defendant); CALIFORNIA WATER SERVICE GROUP, a Delaware corporation, successor in interest to Dominguez Water Corporation (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, acting by and through the Department of Transportation (Plaintiff); As to: BLUE WOLVERINES, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); COUNTY SANITATION DISTRICT NO. 2 (Defendant); CALIFORNIA WATER SERVICE GROUP, a Delaware corporation, successor in interest to Dominguez Water Corporation (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less