This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/30/2023 at 15:00:09 (UTC).

ROBERTO AYALA, ET AL. VS OCCIDENTAL COLLEGE, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/06/2023 ROBERTO AYALA, filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against OCCIDENTAL COLLEGE, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5782

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AYALA ROBERTO

REYES STEPHANIE

Cross Plaintiffs, Defendants and Cross Defendants

OCCIDENTAL COLLEGE A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

TOVEY/SHULTZ CONSTRUCTION INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WEISS GERALDINE ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

DAVIS ERIN M.

ORTIZ NICOLE

 

Court Documents

Unknown Eighth Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts

7/6/2023: Unknown Eighth Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/6/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Summons on Complaint

7/6/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

Complaint

7/6/2023: Complaint

Unknown Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case

7/6/2023: Unknown Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

7/6/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

7/6/2023: First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

7/6/2023: Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/31/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/7/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons Summons On Cross-Complaint

8/30/2023: Summons Summons On Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint

8/30/2023: Cross-Complaint

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/30/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Summons Summons on Complaint

9/19/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

Cross-Complaint

9/19/2023: Cross-Complaint

Answer

9/19/2023: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

9/19/2023: Demand for Jury Trial

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

07/03/2025

Hearing07/03/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/02/2025

Hearing01/02/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/19/2024

Hearing12/19/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023

DocketUpdated -- Cross-Complaint: As To Parties changed from Tovey/Shultz Construction, Inc., a California Corporation (Cross-Complainant) to Tovey/Shultz Construction, Inc., a California Corporation (Cross-Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023

DocketUpdated -- Summons on Complaint: As To Parties changed from Tovey/Shultz Construction, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant) to Tovey/Shultz Construction, Inc., a California Corporation (Cross-Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023

DocketUpdated -- Nicole Ortiz (Attorney): Organization Name changed from Hawkins, Parnell & Young, LLP to Hawkins Parnell & Young LLP; Middle Name: blank

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023

DocketAnswer; Filed by: Occidental College, a California Corporation (Defendant); As to: Roberto Ayala (Plaintiff); Stephanie Reyes (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023

DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Occidental College, a California Corporation (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023

DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: Occidental College, a California Corporation (Defendant); As to: Tovey/Shultz Construction, Inc., a California Corporation (Cross-Complainant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Occidental College, a California Corporation (Defendant); As to: Tovey/Shultz Construction, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
07/07/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Steven A. Ellis in Department 29 Spring Street Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2023

DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 12/19/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Roberto Ayala (Plaintiff); Stephanie Reyes (Plaintiff); As to: Occidental College, a California Corporation (Defendant); Tovey/Shultz Construction, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Roberto Ayala (Plaintiff); Stephanie Reyes (Plaintiff); As to: Occidental College, a California Corporation (Defendant); Tovey/Shultz Construction, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Roberto Ayala (Plaintiff); Stephanie Reyes (Plaintiff); As to: Occidental College, a California Corporation (Defendant); Tovey/Shultz Construction, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2023

DocketEighth Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less