This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/29/2023 at 01:46:28 (UTC).

CHRISTOPHER Y. CHONG VS MARDIROSSIAN AKARAGIAN LLP, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/04/2023 CHRISTOPHER Y CHONG filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against MARDIROSSIAN AKARAGIAN LLP,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7478

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff

CHONG CHRISTOPHER Y.

Defendants

AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP INC.

BLUE SHIELD OF CALIFORNIA

KROLL LAW CORPORATION

MARDIROSSIAN AKARAGIAN LLP

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

MARDIROSSIAN AKARAGIAN LLP

KROLL GERALD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAMIDA NOUR

Defendant Attorney

KROLL GERALD

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

AKARAGIAN ARMEN KEVORK

Cross Defendant Attorney

GEORGE ERIC M.

 

Court Documents

Answer

7/18/2023: Answer

Cross-Complaint

6/5/2023: Cross-Complaint

Answer

5/30/2023: Answer

Cross-Complaint

5/30/2023: Cross-Complaint

Answer

5/30/2023: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/19/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/19/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/19/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/19/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

4/10/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/10/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

4/4/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

4/4/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

4/4/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/4/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/4/2023: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/4/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/4/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2023
  • Hearing09/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 58 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2023
  • Hearing09/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 58 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Christopher Y. Chong (Cross-Defendant); As to: Mardirossian Akaragian LLP (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: Gerald Kroll dba Kroll Law Erroneously Sued As Kroll Law Corporation (Defendant); As to: Christopher Y. Chong (Plaintiff); ROES 1 through 10, inclusive (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Mardirossian Akaragian LLP (Defendant); As to: Christopher Y. Chong (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Gerald Kroll dba Kroll Law Erroneously Sued As Kroll Law Corporation (Defendant); As to: Christopher Y. Chong (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: Mardirossian Akaragian LLP (Defendant); As to: Christopher Y. Chong (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Christopher Y. Chong (Plaintiff); As to: Mardirossian Akaragian LLP (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 04/18/2023; Service Cost: 189.45; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Christopher Y. Chong (Plaintiff); As to: Blue Shield of California (Defendant); Service Date: 04/13/2023; Service Cost: 606.80; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Christopher Y. Chong (Plaintiff); As to: American International Group, Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 04/13/2023; Service Cost: 180.80; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Bruce G. Iwasaki in Department 58 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Christopher Y. Chong (Plaintiff); As to: Mardirossian Akaragian LLP (Defendant); Kroll Law Corporation (Defendant); Blue Shield of California (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Christopher Y. Chong (Plaintiff); As to: Mardirossian Akaragian LLP (Defendant); Kroll Law Corporation (Defendant); Blue Shield of California (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Eric M. George (Attorney); Christopher Y. Chong (Plaintiff); As to: Mardirossian Akaragian LLP (Defendant); Kroll Law Corporation (Defendant); Blue Shield of California (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • DocketCalifornia Uniform Statutory Power of Attorney; Filed by: Christopher Y. Chong (Plaintiff); As to: Mardirossian Akaragian LLP (Defendant); Kroll Law Corporation (Defendant); Blue Shield of California (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less