This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/06/2023 at 19:20:41 (UTC).

ORLANDO GARCIA VS WAYNE LEE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/22/2023 ORLANDO GARCIA filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against WAYNE LEE,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1547

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARCIA ORLANDO

Defendants

ABDULNOUR RAYED

DOES 1 THROUGH 50 INCLUSIVE

LEE FRANCES N.

LEE WAYNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

POTTER MARK DEE

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/22/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/22/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/22/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/22/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/22/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

5/22/2023: Complaint

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/22/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

5/23/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/23/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

5/31/2023: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2023
  • Hearing10/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department K at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2023
  • Hearing10/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department K at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department K Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 10/30/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department K Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 10/30/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department K

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Peter A. Hernandez in Department K Pomona Courthouse South

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 10/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department K

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Orlando Garcia (Plaintiff); As to: Wayne Lee (Defendant); Frances N. Lee (Defendant); Rayed Abdulnour (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Orlando Garcia (Plaintiff); As to: Wayne Lee (Defendant); Frances N. Lee (Defendant); Rayed Abdulnour (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Orlando Garcia (Plaintiff); As to: Wayne Lee (Defendant); Frances N. Lee (Defendant); Rayed Abdulnour (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less