This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/05/2023 at 04:43:56 (UTC).

LAURA L GIRON VS GENERAL MOTORS LLC

Case Summary

On 07/12/2023 LAURA L GIRON filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOEL L. LOFTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1594

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOEL L. LOFTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GIRON LAURA L

Defendant

GENERAL MOTORS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSENSTEIN MICHAEL

Defendant Attorney

BRAR DARSHNIK

 

Court Documents

Summons Summons on Complaint

7/12/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/12/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/12/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/12/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

7/12/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Complaint

7/12/2023: Complaint

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

7/12/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

7/12/2023: First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

7/12/2023: Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

Proof of Personal Service

7/17/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

8/14/2023: Answer

Minute Order Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)

9/19/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)

Notice (name extension) Notice Notice of Ruling

9/19/2023: Notice (name extension) Notice Notice of Ruling

Notice (name extension) Notice of Case Management Conference

10/11/2023: Notice (name extension) Notice of Case Management Conference

Case Management Statement

11/14/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

11/20/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/20/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

12/11/2023

Hearing12/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department X at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801; Case Management Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/20/2023

DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Laura L Giron (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/20/2023

DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Laura L Giron (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2023

DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: General Motors LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2023

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Laura L Giron (Plaintiff); As to: General Motors LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023

DocketNotice Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Laura L Giron (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023

DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department X updated: Result Date to 09/19/2023; Result Type to Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023

DocketUpdated -- Answer: As To Parties changed from Laura L Giron (Plaintiff) to Laura L Giron (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/14/2023

DocketAnswer; Filed by: General Motors LLC (Defendant); As to: Laura L Giron (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
07/12/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 12/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department X

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Joel L. Lofton in Department X Alhambra Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Laura L Giron (Plaintiff); As to: General Motors LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Laura L Giron (Plaintiff); As to: General Motors LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less