This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/17/2023 at 12:06:40 (UTC).

ISABEL RENDON, AN INDIVIDUAL VS HORIZON CONSTRUCTION, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 06/05/2023 ISABEL RENDON, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against HORIZON CONSTRUCTION, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MALCOLM MACKEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2614

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MALCOLM MACKEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RENDON ISABEL

Defendant

HORIZON CONSTRUCTION INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FERRELL SCOTT J. ESQ.

KNOWLES VICTORIA C. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

STILLMAN PHILIP HARRIS

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/5/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/5/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/5/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/5/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

6/5/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

6/5/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

6/5/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/16/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

6/28/2023: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED BY PLAINTIFF AGAIN...) OF 07/10/2023

7/10/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED BY PLAINTIFF AGAIN...) OF 07/10/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED BY PLAINTIFF AGAIN...)

7/10/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED BY PLAINTIFF AGAIN...)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/11/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

7/20/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Unknown - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

7/31/2023: Unknown - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

Notice of Status Conference and Order

8/4/2023: Notice of Status Conference and Order

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/12/2023

Hearing09/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023

DocketStatus Conference scheduled for 09/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 14

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023

DocketNotice of Status Conference and Order; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/31/2023

DocketDeclaration of Demurring Party in Support of Automatic Extension; Filed by: Horizon Construction, Inc. (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023

DocketNotice OF CASE REASSIGNMENT; Filed by: Isabel Rendon (Plaintiff); As to: Horizon Construction, Inc. (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2023

DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Isabel Rendon (Plaintiff); As to: Horizon Construction, Inc. (Defendant); Service Cost: 79.00; Proof of Mailing Date: 06/27/2023; Service Cost Waived: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2023

DocketUpdated -- Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6): Filed By: Isabel Rendon (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 07/10/2023 ; As To Parties:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2023

DocketUpdated -- Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6): As To Parties:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2023

DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 14 - Hon. Cherol J. Nellon; Reason: Challenge / Recusal, by Plaintiff

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2023

DocketMinute Order (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED BY PLAINTIFF AGAIN...)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
06/09/2023

DocketUpdated -- Isabel Rendon (Plaintiff): Last Name changed from Rendon, an individual to Rendon

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2023

DocketUpdated -- Horizon Construction, Inc. (Defendant): Organization Name changed from Horizon Construction, Inc., a California corporation to Horizon Construction, Inc.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Isabel Rendon, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Horizon Construction, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Isabel Rendon, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Horizon Construction, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Isabel Rendon, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Horizon Construction, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Malcolm Mackey in Department 55 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less