This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/13/2023 at 07:26:30 (UTC).

MARIA MEJIA VS DAVID GONZALES

Case Summary

On 05/22/2023 MARIA MEJIA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DAVID GONZALES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1064

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEJIA MARIA

Defendant

GONZALES DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MILLER DANIEL B.

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/22/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/22/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/22/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/22/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/22/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

5/22/2023: Complaint

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/22/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

5/23/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/23/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2024
  • Hearing01/09/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department D at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2023
  • Hearing11/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department D at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/09/2024 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ralph C. Hofer in Department D Glendale Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Maria Mejia (Plaintiff); As to: David Gonzales (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Maria Mejia (Plaintiff); As to: David Gonzales (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Maria Mejia (Plaintiff); As to: David Gonzales (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less