This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/29/2023 at 14:10:25 (UTC).

FEDERAL EXPRESS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION VS STEVEN LEE NESS, AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Summary

On 08/28/2023 FEDERAL EXPRESS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STEVEN LEE NESS, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0652

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FEDERAL EXPRESS CORPORATION A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Defendant

NESS AN INDIVIDUAL STEVEN LEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LLOYD PRISCILLA W.

 

Court Documents

Unknown Eighth Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts

8/28/2023: Unknown Eighth Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/28/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Summons on Complaint

8/28/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

Complaint

8/28/2023: Complaint

Unknown Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case

8/28/2023: Unknown Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

8/28/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

8/28/2023: First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

8/28/2023: Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

Notice (name extension) Notice CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS

8/29/2023: Notice (name extension) Notice CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS

Notice (name extension) Notice OF ACTION FILED

9/12/2023: Notice (name extension) Notice OF ACTION FILED

 

Docket Entries

08/25/2025

Hearing08/25/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/24/2025

Hearing02/24/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/10/2025

Hearing02/10/2025 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023

DocketNotice OF ACTION FILED; Filed by: FEDERAL EXPRESS CORPORATION, a Delaware Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: STEVEN LEE NESS, an individual (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2023

DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/24/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 08/25/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2023

DocketNotice CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS; Filed by: FEDERAL EXPRESS CORPORATION, a Delaware Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: STEVEN LEE NESS, an individual (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lisa R. Jaskol in Department 28 Spring Street Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2023

DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 02/10/2025 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: FEDERAL EXPRESS CORPORATION, a Delaware Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: STEVEN LEE NESS, an individual (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: FEDERAL EXPRESS CORPORATION, a Delaware Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: STEVEN LEE NESS, an individual (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: FEDERAL EXPRESS CORPORATION, a Delaware Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: STEVEN LEE NESS, an individual (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023

DocketEighth Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less