This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/25/2023 at 15:23:54 (UTC).

SYLVIA TASHJIAN, ET AL. VS AZUL HOSPITALITY GROUP LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/16/2023 SYLVIA TASHJIAN, filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AZUL HOSPITALITY GROUP LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL P. LINFIELD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1023

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL P. LINFIELD

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TASHJIAN ADAM

TASHJIAN SYLVIA

Defendants

AZUL HOSPITALITY GROUP LLC DBA THE GLENMARK TRIBUTE PORTFOLIO

GEORGES TANIA

THE GLENMARK HOTEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELIHU KAVEH S.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/13/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

9/6/2023: Case Management Statement

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/30/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/30/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/30/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

7/14/2023: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/12/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/1/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

5/26/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/26/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/26/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/16/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/16/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/16/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/16/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/16/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/16/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

5/16/2023: Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2023
  • Hearing10/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 34 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment scheduled for 10/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 34

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 09/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 34 updated: Result Date to 09/13/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Sylvia Tashjian (Plaintiff); Adam Tashjian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2023
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Sylvia Tashjian (Plaintiff); Adam Tashjian (Plaintiff); As to: Azul Hospitality Group LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2023
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Sylvia Tashjian (Plaintiff); Adam Tashjian (Plaintiff); As to: The Glenmark Hotel (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2023
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Sylvia Tashjian (Plaintiff); Adam Tashjian (Plaintiff); As to: Tania Georges (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2023
  • DocketDefault entered as to Azul Hospitality Group LLC; On the Complaint filed by Sylvia Tashjian, et al. on 05/16/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2023
  • DocketDefault entered as to The Glenmark Hotel; On the Complaint filed by Sylvia Tashjian, et al. on 05/16/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Kaveh S. Elihu, Esq. (Attorney): Organization Name changed from EMPLOYEE JUSTICE LEGAL GROUP, P.C. to Employee Justice Legal Group, P.C. Name Suffix: Esq. Middle Name changed from Sam to S.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketAddress for Kaveh S. Elihu, Esq. (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael P. Linfield in Department 34 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Sylvia Tashjian (Plaintiff); Adam Tashjian (Plaintiff); As to: Azul Hospitality Group LLC (Defendant); The Glenmark Hotel (Defendant); Tania Georges (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Sylvia Tashjian (Plaintiff); Adam Tashjian (Plaintiff); As to: Azul Hospitality Group LLC (Defendant); The Glenmark Hotel (Defendant); Tania Georges (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Sylvia Tashjian (Plaintiff); Adam Tashjian (Plaintiff); As to: Azul Hospitality Group LLC (Defendant); The Glenmark Hotel (Defendant); Tania Georges (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less