This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/22/2023 at 04:14:15 (UTC).

LINDA SANTIAGO VS JENIA AMIRIAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/05/2023 LINDA SANTIAGO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JENIA AMIRIAN,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1489

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANTIAGO LINDA

Cross Defendants and Defendants

AMIRIAN JENIA

SMITH EVAN

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

SMITH EVAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SEROPIAN JACOB H.

Defendant Attorneys

FLOCK JOHN K.

KALPAKIAN STEPHEN M

 

Court Documents

Complaint

4/5/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/5/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/5/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/5/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/5/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

4/5/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

4/5/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

4/5/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/6/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE PLEADING AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO SERVE AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/5/2023: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE PLEADING AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO SERVE AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Answer

7/3/2023: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

7/3/2023: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

7/7/2023: Answer

Cross-Complaint

7/11/2023: Cross-Complaint

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2023
  • Hearing08/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department T at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Cross-Complaint: As To Parties changed from JENIA AMIRIAN (Defendant) to JENIA AMIRIAN (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: EVAN SMITH (Defendant); As to: JENIA AMIRIAN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: EVAN SMITH (Defendant); As to: LINDA SANTIAGO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: JENIA AMIRIAN (Defendant); As to: LINDA SANTIAGO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2023
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: JENIA AMIRIAN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleading and Order Extending Time to Serve and Order Continuing Case Management Conference: Filed By: LINDA SANTIAGO (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 06/05/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • DocketEx Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleading and Order Extending Time to Serve and Order Continuing Case Management Conference; Signed and Filed by: LINDA SANTIAGO (Plaintiff); As to: JENIA AMIRIAN (Defendant); EVAN SMITH (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department T Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 08/11/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department T

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: LINDA SANTIAGO (Plaintiff); As to: JENIA AMIRIAN (Defendant); EVAN SMITH (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: LINDA SANTIAGO (Plaintiff); As to: JENIA AMIRIAN (Defendant); EVAN SMITH (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: LINDA SANTIAGO (Plaintiff); As to: JENIA AMIRIAN (Defendant); EVAN SMITH (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: LINDA SANTIAGO (Plaintiff); As to: JENIA AMIRIAN (Defendant); EVAN SMITH (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Shirley K. Watkins in Department T Van Nuys Courthouse East

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less