This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/12/2023 at 08:14:00 (UTC).

MICHELLE BOHMAN, ET AL. VS JOHNSON & JOHNSON, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/30/2023 MICHELLE BOHMAN, filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against JOHNSON JOHNSON,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1037

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BOHMAN MICHELLE

CAROTHERS CHRISTOPHER

CAROTHERS STEPHEN

Defendants

CVS PHARMACY INC.

JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.

JOHNSON & JOHNSON

JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC.

JOHNSON & JOHNSON HOLDCO NA INC.

KENVUE INC.

LTL MANAGEMENT LLC

RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY

SAVE MART SUPERMARKETS

THRIFTY PAYLESS INC. DBA RITE AID PHARMACY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

ASHRAFI BENNO

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/30/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

8/30/2023: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/30/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/30/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHELLE BOHMAN

8/30/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHELLE BOHMAN

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF DEPOSITING JURY FEES

8/31/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF DEPOSITING JURY FEES

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

9/5/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

9/7/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Proof of Personal Service

9/11/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/11/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/11/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/11/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/11/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/11/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/11/2023: Proof of Personal Service

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/07/2023

DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Deemed Complex

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: JCCP Coordinated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023

DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Michelle Bohman (Plaintiff); As to: Johnson & Johnson (Defendant); Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Defendant); Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2023

DocketPlaintiffs' Notice of Depositing Jury Fees; Filed by: Michelle Bohman (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Laura A. Seigle in Department 15 Spring Street Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Michelle Bohman (Plaintiff); Stephen Carothers (Plaintiff); Christopher Carothers (Plaintiff); As to: Johnson & Johnson (Defendant); CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Defendant); Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Michelle Bohman (Plaintiff); Stephen Carothers (Plaintiff); Christopher Carothers (Plaintiff); As to: Johnson & Johnson (Defendant); CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Defendant); Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Michelle Bohman (Plaintiff); Stephen Carothers (Plaintiff); Christopher Carothers (Plaintiff); As to: Johnson & Johnson (Defendant); CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Defendant); Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2023

DocketDeclaration of Michelle Bohman; Filed by: Michelle Bohman (Plaintiff); Stephen Carothers (Plaintiff); Christopher Carothers (Plaintiff); As to: Johnson & Johnson (Defendant); CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Defendant); Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2023

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Asbestos

[+] Read More [-] Read Less