This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/30/2023 at 00:04:28 (UTC).

PAWNEE LEASING CORPORATION VS SALVADOR MUNOZ SANTILLANO

Case Summary

On 08/10/2023 PAWNEE LEASING CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SALVADOR MUNOZ SANTILLANO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2617

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PAWNEE LEASING CORPORATION

Defendant

SANTILLANO SALVADOR MUNOZ AKA SALVADOR SANTILLANO MUNOZ DBA SANTILLANO TRANSPORT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FERNS BARRY

 

Court Documents

Complaint VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. Breach of Contract 2. Open Book 3. Account Stated 4. Reasonable Value 5. Possession (Claim and Delivery) 6. Willful and Malicious Conversion

8/10/2023: Complaint VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. Breach of Contract 2. Open Book 3. Account Stated 4. Reasonable Value 5. Possession (Claim and Delivery) 6. Willful and Malicious Conversion

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/10/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet And Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum

8/10/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet And Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum

Summons Summons on Complaint

8/10/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

8/10/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

8/10/2023: First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

8/10/2023: Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

8/17/2023: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/17/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service Proof of Service of Summons

9/18/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service Proof of Service of Summons

Case Management Statement

11/13/2023: Case Management Statement

Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing

11/14/2023: Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing

Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing

11/14/2023: Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

01/30/2024

Hearing01/30/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Case Management Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/21/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service, Failure to Prosecute, Failure to File Case Management Conference Statement scheduled for 11/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/21/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2023

DocketCertificate of Mailing for Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2023

DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Pawnee Leasing Corporation (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2023

DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment - Rejected; Submitted by: Pawnee Leasing Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Salvador Munoz Santillano (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023

DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by: Pawnee Leasing Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Salvador Munoz Santillano (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No; Service Cost: 187.50; Proof of Mailing Date: 09/06/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2023

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/30/2024 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service, Failure to Prosecute, Failure to File Case Management Conference Statement scheduled for 11/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/14/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Gary Y. Tanaka in Department B Torrance Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Filed by: Pawnee Leasing Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Salvador Munoz Santillano (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2023

DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. Breach of Contract 2. Open Book 3. Account Stated 4. Reasonable Value 5. Possession (Claim and Delivery) 6. Willful and Malicious Conversion; Filed by: Pawnee Leasing Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Salvador Munoz Santillano (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet And Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum; Filed by: Pawnee Leasing Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Salvador Munoz Santillano (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less