This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/04/2023 at 00:17:31 (UTC).

MOISES ANGUIANO VS CITY OF ARCADIA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/02/2023 MOISES ANGUIANO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF ARCADIA,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOEL L. LOFTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0981

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOEL L. LOFTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANGUIANO MOISES

Defendants

ARCADIA PUBLIC WORKS SERVICES DEPARTMENT

CITY OF ARCADIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHAMPION KIARASH SHAMLOO

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/2/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/2/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/2/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/2/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/2/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

5/2/2023: Complaint

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/2/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

5/3/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/3/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

7/26/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2023
  • Hearing10/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department X at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department X Held - Continued was rescheduled to 10/04/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department X Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 07/26/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department X

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 10/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department X

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department X

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Joel L. Lofton in Department X Alhambra Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Summons on Complaint: As To Parties changed from CITY OF ARCADIA (Defendant), ARCADIA PUBLIC WORKS SERVICES DEPARTMENT (Defendant) to CITY OF ARCADIA (Defendant), ARCADIA PUBLIC WORKS SERVICES DEPARTMENT (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Moises Anguiano (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF ARCADIA (Defendant); ARCADIA PUBLIC WORKS SERVICES DEPARTMENT (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Moises Anguiano (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF ARCADIA (Defendant); ARCADIA PUBLIC WORKS SERVICES DEPARTMENT (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Moises Anguiano (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF ARCADIA (Defendant); ARCADIA PUBLIC WORKS SERVICES DEPARTMENT (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less