This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/25/2023 at 21:31:19 (UTC).

MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY VS COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Case Summary

On 05/23/2023 MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2256

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NIVINSKUS MARK

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/23/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/23/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/23/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

5/23/2023: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/23/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

5/23/2023: Complaint

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/23/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/23/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/24/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2023
  • Hearing09/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elaine W. Mandel in Department P Santa Monica Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 09/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketStatement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by: MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less