This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/22/2023 at 10:46:05 (UTC).

FIROZA BHARUCHA VS STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/24/2023 FIROZA BHARUCHA filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2290

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BHARUCHA FIROZA

Defendant

STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KECHICHIAN JACK K

Defendant Attorney

ELIE STEVEN JAY

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/24/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/24/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/24/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/24/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/24/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/24/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/24/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/25/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

6/16/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

7/27/2023: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2023
  • Hearing10/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: State Farm General Insurance Company (Defendant); As to: Firoza Bharucha (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Firoza Bharucha (Plaintiff); As to: State Farm General Insurance Company (Defendant); Service Date: 06/09/2023; Service Cost: 112.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 10/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Firoza Bharucha (Plaintiff); As to: State Farm General Insurance Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Firoza Bharucha (Plaintiff); As to: State Farm General Insurance Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Firoza Bharucha (Plaintiff); As to: State Farm General Insurance Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Huey P. Cotton in Department A Van Nuys Courthouse East

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less