This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/22/2023 at 19:50:58 (UTC).

CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC., VS EVINFUSIONS LLC

Case Summary

On 08/15/2023 CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC , filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against EVINFUSIONS LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HUEY P. COTTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3562

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HUEY P. COTTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU INC.

Defendants

EVINFUSIONS LLC DBA IV PARLOUR

EV INFUSIONS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JYOO JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/15/2023: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/15/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/15/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/15/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/15/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

8/15/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

8/15/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

8/15/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

8/23/2023: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

8/24/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/24/2023

8/24/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/24/2023

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

8/24/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

 

Docket Entries

01/08/2024

Hearing01/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department W at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023

DocketUpdated -- Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6): Filed By: CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC., (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 08/24/2023 ; As To Parties:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023

DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023

DocketCase reassigned to Van Nuys Courthouse East in Department W - Hon. Virginia Keeny; Reason: Challenge / Recusal, by Plaintiff

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023

DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 08/24/2023; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023

DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023

DocketUpdated -- 01/08/2024 Case Management Conference: Location changed from Department A to Department W

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023

DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by: CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC., (Plaintiff); Judge Name: Huey P. Cotton

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC., (Plaintiff); As to: EVINFUSIONS LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Huey P. Cotton in Department A Van Nuys Courthouse East

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC., (Plaintiff); As to: EVINFUSIONS LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC., (Plaintiff); As to: EVINFUSIONS LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department A

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less