This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/09/2023 at 07:13:33 (UTC).

JEREMY SIMON BENLOULOU VS VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA INC

Case Summary

On 05/26/2023 JEREMY SIMON BENLOULOU filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Beverly Hills Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2321

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BENLOULOU JEREMY SIMON

Defendant

VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSE ADAM

Defendant Attorney

PETROSYAN ASLAN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/26/2023: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/26/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/26/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/26/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/26/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/26/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/26/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/26/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Proof of Personal Service

6/1/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

6/29/2023: Answer

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

6/29/2023: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

7/17/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2023
  • Hearing11/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 207 at 9355 Burton Way, Beverly Hills, CA 90210; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to Beverly Hills Courthouse in Department 207 - Hon. Michael E. Whitaker; Reason: Transfer for Reassignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA INC (Defendant); As to: Jeremy Simon Benloulou (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2023
  • DocketNotice NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE; Filed by: VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA INC (Defendant); As to: Jeremy Simon Benloulou (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Jeremy Simon Benloulou (Plaintiff); As to: VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA INC (Defendant); Service Date: 05/31/2023; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 11/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Beverly Hills Courthouse at Department 207

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Helen Zukin in Department 207 Beverly Hills Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jeremy Simon Benloulou (Plaintiff); As to: VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA INC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jeremy Simon Benloulou (Plaintiff); As to: VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA INC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jeremy Simon Benloulou (Plaintiff); As to: VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA INC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less