This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/01/2023 at 08:08:07 (UTC).

CHUBB INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY VS EVENT APPAREL, INC., A CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 05/08/2023 CHUBB INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against EVENT APPAREL, INC , A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1029

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHUBB INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

EVENT APPAREL INC. A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GABA RODOLFO JR

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/8/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/8/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/8/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/8/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/8/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

5/8/2023: Complaint

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/8/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

5/9/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/9/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2023
  • Hearing10/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2023
  • Hearing07/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 10/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. John J. Kralik in Department B Burbank Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Event Apparel, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Event Apparel, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Event Apparel, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less