This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/11/2023 at 04:04:36 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS DEVONTE FOX, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/18/2023 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DEVONTE FOX,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1135

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

EAN HOLDINGS LLC

FOX DEVONTE AKA DEVON FOX

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ESPINOSA TRISTAN P

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/18/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/18/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

5/18/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/18/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/18/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/18/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration - DECLARATION OF VENUE

5/18/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF VENUE

Complaint

5/18/2023: Complaint

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/18/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/18/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/18/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Request for Dismissal

6/21/2023: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/21/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2023
  • Hearing10/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 3 at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2023
  • Hearing07/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 3 at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company on 05/18/2023, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company as to Ean Holdings LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2023
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Devonte Fox (Defendant); Ean Holdings LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Ean Holdings LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Devonte Fox (Defendant); Ean Holdings LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Declaration OF VENUE: As To Parties changed from Devonte Fox (Defendant), Ean Holdings LLC (Defendant) to Ean Holdings LLC (Defendant), Devonte Fox (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Summons on Complaint: As To Parties changed from Ean Holdings LLC (Defendant), Devonte Fox (Defendant) to Devonte Fox (Defendant), Ean Holdings LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketAddress for Tristan P Espinosa (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Tristan P Espinosa (Attorney): Organization Name: Reese Law Group

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Devonte Fox (Defendant); Ean Holdings LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketDeclaration OF VENUE; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Devonte Fox (Defendant); Ean Holdings LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Devonte Fox (Defendant); Ean Holdings LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Civil Case Cover Sheet: As To Parties changed from Devonte Fox (Defendant), Ean Holdings LLC (Defendant) to Ean Holdings LLC (Defendant), Devonte Fox (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less