This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/17/2023 at 01:35:39 (UTC).

JAMES MANN VS KTLA, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/21/2023 JAMES MANN filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against KTLA, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8875

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MANN JAMES

Defendants

KTLA INC.

KTLA LLC

NEXSTAR MEDIA GROUP INC.

NEXSTAR MEDIA INC.

TRIBUNE MEDIA COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARA DAVID

Defendant Attorney

KOZLOW ANDREW J.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order Minute Order (Initial Status Conference)

8/16/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Initial Status Conference)

Order (name extension) Order Re: Electronic Filing and Service

8/16/2023: Order (name extension) Order Re: Electronic Filing and Service

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Proof of Service

8/9/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Proof of Service

Status Conference Statement Joint Initial Status Conference Class Action Response Statement

8/9/2023: Status Conference Statement Joint Initial Status Conference Class Action Response Statement

Stipulation and Order (name extension) Stipulation And [Proposed] Order to Continue Case Management Conference

6/13/2023: Stipulation and Order (name extension) Stipulation And [Proposed] Order to Continue Case Management Conference

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/9/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Answer Defendants Nexstar Media Group, Inc. and Nexstar Media Inc.'s Answer

6/7/2023: Answer Defendants Nexstar Media Group, Inc. and Nexstar Media Inc.'s Answer

Case Management Statement

6/1/2023: Case Management Statement

Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order Re: Newly Filed Case)

5/3/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order Re: Newly Filed Case)

Initial Status Conference Order

5/3/2023: Initial Status Conference Order

Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Newly Filed Case) of 05/03/2023, Initial Status Conference Order

5/3/2023: Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Newly Filed Case) of 05/03/2023, Initial Status Conference Order

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/2/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service Proof of Service by Substituted Service of Summons

5/2/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service Proof of Service by Substituted Service of Summons

Proof of Service by Substituted Service Proof of Service by Substituted Service of Summons

5/2/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service Proof of Service by Substituted Service of Summons

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Notice of Payment of Jury Fees

4/28/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Notice of Payment of Jury Fees

Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

4/21/2023: Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

4/21/2023: First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

4/21/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

12/04/2023

Hearing12/04/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 11 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Further Status Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023

DocketFurther Status Conference scheduled for 12/04/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 11

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023

DocketOrder Re: Electronic Filing and Service; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023

DocketMinute Order (Initial Status Conference)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023

DocketInitial Status Conference scheduled for 08/16/2023 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 11 updated: Result Date to 08/16/2023; Result Type to Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2023

DocketJoint Initial Status Conference Class Action Response Statement; Filed by: James Mann (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2023

DocketProof of Service; Filed by: James Mann (Plaintiff); As to: KTLA, INC. (Defendant); KTLA, LLC (Defendant); Nexstar Media Group Inc. (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2023

DocketStipulation And [Proposed] Order to Continue Case Management Conference; Signed and Filed by: James Mann (Plaintiff); As to: KTLA, INC. (Defendant); KTLA, LLC (Defendant); Nexstar Media Group Inc. (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2023

DocketUpdated -- Stipulation And [Proposed] Order to Continue Case Management Conference: Filed By: James Mann (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 06/13/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2023

DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Initial Status Conference scheduled for 06/16/2023 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 11 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 08/16/2023 10:30 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
04/21/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: James Mann (Plaintiff); As to: KTLA, INC. (Defendant); KTLA, LLC (Defendant); Nexstar Media Group Inc. (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. David S. Cunningham III in Department 11 Spring Street Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: James Mann (Plaintiff); As to: KTLA, INC. (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: James Mann (Plaintiff); As to: KTLA, INC. (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2023

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Class Action

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2023

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

[+] Read More [-] Read Less