This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/19/2023 at 11:18:05 (UTC).

CITY OF SANTA MONICA VS BENYAMIN AGHACHI

Case Summary

On 05/01/2023 CITY OF SANTA MONICA filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BENYAMIN AGHACHI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1921

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF SANTA MONICA

Defendant

AGHACHI BENYAMIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RHOADES GARY WAYNE

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/1/2023: Complaint

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/1/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/1/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/1/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/1/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/1/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/1/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/3/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/3/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Proof of Personal Service

5/25/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

6/20/2023: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Proof of Personal Service

7/11/2023: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2023
  • Hearing10/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department R at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: City of Santa Monica (Plaintiff); As to: Benyamin Aghachi (Defendant); Service Cost: 283.73; Service Date: 07/10/2023; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • DocketAmended Complaint (1st); Filed by: City of Santa Monica (Plaintiff); As to: Benyamin Aghachi (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: City of Santa Monica (Plaintiff); As to: Benyamin Aghachi (Defendant); Service Date: 05/24/2023; Service Cost: 577.65; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mark H. Epstein in Department R Santa Monica Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 10/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department R

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: City of Santa Monica (Plaintiff); As to: Benyamin Aghachi (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: City of Santa Monica (Plaintiff); As to: Benyamin Aghachi (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: City of Santa Monica (Plaintiff); As to: Benyamin Aghachi (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less