This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/20/2023 at 09:38:33 (UTC).

CHANTAL HAKAKEYAN VS FCA US LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/24/2023 CHANTAL HAKAKEYAN filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against FCA US LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1077

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HAKAKEYAN CHANTAL

Defendant

FCA US LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JACOBSON KEVIN

Defendant Attorney

HANSON ERIN E.

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/24/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/24/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/24/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/24/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

5/24/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Complaint

5/24/2023: Complaint

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/24/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/24/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/24/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Proof of Personal Service

5/31/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

6/30/2023: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2024
  • Hearing01/10/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department D at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2023
  • Hearing11/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department D at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant); As to: Chantal Hakakeyan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Chantal Hakakeyan (Plaintiff); As to: FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Service Date: 05/30/2023; Service Cost: 30.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Chantal Hakakeyan (Plaintiff); As to: FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/10/2024 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ralph C. Hofer in Department D Glendale Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Chantal Hakakeyan (Plaintiff); As to: FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Chantal Hakakeyan (Plaintiff); As to: FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less