This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/24/2023 at 13:11:02 (UTC).

CHANTAL HAKAKEYAN VS FCA US LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/24/2023 CHANTAL HAKAKEYAN filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against FCA US LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RALPH C. HOFER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1077

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RALPH C. HOFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HAKAKEYAN CHANTAL

Defendant

FCA US LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JACOBSON KEVIN Y.

Defendant Attorney

HANSON ERIN E.

 

Court Documents

Summons Summons on Complaint

5/24/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/24/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/24/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/24/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

5/24/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Complaint

5/24/2023: Complaint

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/24/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

5/24/2023: First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

5/24/2023: Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

Proof of Personal Service

5/31/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

6/30/2023: Answer

Minute Order Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)

11/6/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)

 

Docket Entries

01/10/2024

Hearing01/10/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department D at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Case Management Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/06/2023

DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/06/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department D updated: Result Date to 11/06/2023; Result Type to Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2023

DocketUpdated -- Kevin Y. Jacobson (Attorney): Middle Name: Y.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2023

DocketAddress for Kevin Y. Jacobson (Attorney) updated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2023

DocketAddress for Erin E. Hanson (Attorney) updated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2023

DocketAnswer; Filed by: FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant); As to: Chantal Hakakeyan (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023

DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Chantal Hakakeyan (Plaintiff); As to: FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Service Date: 05/30/2023; Service Cost: 30.00; Service Cost Waived: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Chantal Hakakeyan (Plaintiff); As to: FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department D

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
05/24/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/10/2024 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department D

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ralph C. Hofer in Department D Glendale Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Chantal Hakakeyan (Plaintiff); As to: FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Chantal Hakakeyan (Plaintiff); As to: FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less