This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/21/2023 at 03:20:42 (UTC).

JESUS PENA VS GENERAL MOTORS LLC

Case Summary

On 07/13/2023 JESUS PENA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL L. ALEXANDER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0734

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL L. ALEXANDER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PENA JESUS

Defendant

GENERAL MOTORS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GEOULLA BRYAN

Defendant Attorney

BRAR DARSHNIK

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/13/2023: Complaint

Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

7/13/2023: Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/13/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/13/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Summons on Complaint

7/13/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

7/13/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

7/13/2023: First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/14/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

7/19/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

8/16/2023: Answer

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

8/30/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Case Management Statement

10/11/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

10/19/2023: Case Management Statement

Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of 11/08/2023

11/8/2023: Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of 11/08/2023

Minute Order Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

11/8/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

01/24/2025

Hearing01/24/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Jury Trial

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/15/2025

Hearing01/15/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Final Status Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2023

DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 01/15/2025 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2023

DocketJury Trial (5-day estimate) scheduled for 01/24/2025 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2023

DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2023

DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of 11/08/2023; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 11/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15 updated: Result Date to 11/08/2023; Result Type to Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2023

DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: JESUS PENA (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2023

DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: GENERAL MOTORS LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2023

DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
07/14/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael C. Kelley in Department A15 Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 11/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: JESUS PENA (Plaintiff); As to: GENERAL MOTORS LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: JESUS PENA (Plaintiff); As to: GENERAL MOTORS LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: JESUS PENA (Plaintiff); As to: GENERAL MOTORS LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less