This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/03/2023 at 04:28:33 (UTC).

CHRISTOPHER JACOBY VS BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/22/2023 CHRISTOPHER JACOBY filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1610

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JACOBY CHRISTOPHER

Defendants

BMW OF NORTH AMERICA LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

DOES 1 THROUGH 10 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROMANO MARK

Defendant Attorney

DAO VANESSA

 

Court Documents

Complaint - COMPLAINT 1. SONG-BEYERLY ACT 2. MAGNUSON-MOSS ACT

5/22/2023: Complaint - COMPLAINT 1. SONG-BEYERLY ACT 2. MAGNUSON-MOSS ACT

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/22/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/22/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET AND CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM

5/22/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet - CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET AND CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/22/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/22/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/22/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/22/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Proof of Personal Service

6/20/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

6/26/2023: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2023
  • Hearing11/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 8 at One Regent Street, Inglewood, CA 90301; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: BMW of North America, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant); As to: Christopher Jacoby (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Christopher Jacoby (Plaintiff); As to: BMW of North America, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Service Date: 05/24/2023; Service Cost: 80.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketCOMPLAINT 1. SONG-BEYERLY ACT 2. MAGNUSON-MOSS ACT; Filed by: Christopher Jacoby (Plaintiff); As to: BMW of North America, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant); DOES 1 through 10, Inclusive (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Filed by: Christopher Jacoby (Plaintiff); As to: BMW of North America, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant); DOES 1 through 10, Inclusive (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ronald F. Frank in Department 8 Inglewood Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketAddress for Mark Romano (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet and Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum; Filed by: Christopher Jacoby (Plaintiff); As to: BMW of North America, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 11/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less