This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/18/2023 at 00:49:41 (UTC).

KATELYN ADCOX, ET AL. VS KIA AMERICA, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 05/30/2023 KATELYN ADCOX, filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against KIA AMERICA, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Covina Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1605

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ADCOX KATELYN

WEBB TAYLOR

Defendant

KIA AMERICA INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROMANO MARK

Defendant Attorney

PROUDFOOT MATTHEW M.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/30/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/30/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/30/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/30/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/30/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/30/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/30/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

6/1/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/1/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Answer

6/27/2023: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

6/27/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER

7/3/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

8/2/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

8/8/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2023
  • Hearing10/18/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 6 at 1427 West Covina Parkway, West Covina, CA 91790; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to West Covina Courthouse in Department 6 - Hon. Lynette Gridiron Winstoneffective 08/14/2023; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to Pomona Courthouse South in Department O - Hon. Christian R. Gulloneffective 08/14/2023; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to West Covina Courthouse in Department 6 - Hon. Lynette Gridiron Winstoneffective 08/14/2023; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- 10/18/2023 Case Management Conference: Location changed from Department O to Department 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2023
  • DocketStipulation and Order Stipulation and Protective Order; Signed and Filed by: Kia America, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); As to: Katelyn Adcox (Plaintiff); Taylor Webb (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order Stipulation and Protective Order: Filed By: Kia America, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 07/03/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/18/2023 at 09:00 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department O Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/30/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 10/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department O Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/01/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Christian R. Gullon in Department O Pomona Courthouse South

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Katelyn Adcox (Plaintiff); Taylor Webb (Plaintiff); As to: Kia America, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Katelyn Adcox (Plaintiff); Taylor Webb (Plaintiff); As to: Kia America, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Katelyn Adcox (Plaintiff); Taylor Webb (Plaintiff); As to: Kia America, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less