This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/17/2023 at 02:27:35 (UTC).

ESCALANTE SANTILLAN, DARWIN AARON VS SOLIS VASQUEZ, CELIA ZULEMA

Case Summary

On 06/22/2023 ESCALANTE SANTILLAN, DARWIN AARON filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against SOLIS VASQUEZ, CELIA ZULEMA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KAUFMAN, SHELLEY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0008

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KAUFMAN, SHELLEY

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ESCALANTE SANTILLAN DARWIN AARON

Respondent

SOLIS VASQUEZ CELIA ZULEMA

Not Classified By Court

GASCON GEORGE - District Attorney

 

Court Documents

Miscellaneous - Re: Points and Authorities In Support Of Expedited Proceedings Under The Hague Convention On The Civil Aspects Of International Child Abduction

6/22/2023: Miscellaneous - Re: Points and Authorities In Support Of Expedited Proceedings Under The Hague Convention On The Civil Aspects Of International Child Abduction

Miscellaneous - Momorandum Of Law: The Conventiona On The Civil Aspects Of International Child abduction, Done At The Hague, Oct. 25, 1980; -and- The International Child Abductin Remedies Act, 22 U.S

6/22/2023: Miscellaneous - Momorandum Of Law: The Conventiona On The Civil Aspects Of International Child abduction, Done At The Hague, Oct. 25, 1980; -and- The International Child Abductin Remedies Act, 22 U.S

Miscellaneous - Re: Petition For A Warrant In Lieu Of A Writ Of Habeas Corpus

6/22/2023: Miscellaneous - Re: Petition For A Warrant In Lieu Of A Writ Of Habeas Corpus

Warrant - Issued - Warrant in Lieu of Writ of Habeas Corpus ** File Copy **

6/22/2023: Warrant - Issued - Warrant in Lieu of Writ of Habeas Corpus ** File Copy **

Petition - Habeas Corpus - Family Law - RE: Petition For Return Of Minor Children To Petitioner Under The Hague Convention And Declaration Of Rosa Alarcon

6/22/2023: Petition - Habeas Corpus - Family Law - RE: Petition For Return Of Minor Children To Petitioner Under The Hague Convention And Declaration Of Rosa Alarcon

Notice - Re: Notice Of Application For The Return Of the Minor Child Under The Hague Convention On The Civil Aspects Of International Child Abduction

6/22/2023: Notice - Re: Notice Of Application For The Return Of the Minor Child Under The Hague Convention On The Civil Aspects Of International Child Abduction

Declaration - of Investigator Stanya Blakely in Support of Request for Protective Custody Warrant

7/12/2023: Declaration - of Investigator Stanya Blakely in Support of Request for Protective Custody Warrant

Warrant - Issued - Protective Custody Warrant ** File Copy **

7/12/2023: Warrant - Issued - Protective Custody Warrant ** File Copy **

Minute Order

7/26/2023: Minute Order

Proof of Service

7/26/2023: Proof of Service

Minute Order

8/10/2023: Minute Order

Stipulation

8/10/2023: Stipulation

Minute Order

8/14/2023: Minute Order

Minute Order as Order After Hearing

8/15/2023: Minute Order as Order After Hearing

Minute Order

8/15/2023: Minute Order

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/15/2023

Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 2, Kaufman, Shelley, Presiding; Habeas Corpus Hearing - Held - Order Made

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023

DocketMinute Order as Order After Hearing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/14/2023

Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 2, Kaufman, Shelley, Presiding; Habeas Corpus Hearing - Held - Order Made

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/14/2023

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/14/2023

DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2023

Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 2, Kaufman, Shelley, Presiding; Habeas Corpus Hearing - Held - Order Made

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2023

DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2023

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2023

DocketStipulation; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
07/26/2023

DocketProof of Service; Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023

DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023

DocketWarrant - Issued (Protective Custody Warrant ** File Copy ** )

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023

DocketDeclaration (of Investigator Stanya Blakely in Support of Request for Protective Custody Warrant ); Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2023

DocketMiscellaneous (Re: Points and Authorities In Support Of Expedited Proceedings Under The Hague Convention On The Civil Aspects Of International Child Abduction ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2023

DocketMiscellaneous (Momorandum Of Law: The Conventiona On The Civil Aspects Of International Child abduction, Done At The Hague, Oct. 25, 1980; -and- The International Child Abductin Remedies Act, 22 U.S.C. 9001, et. seq. ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2023

DocketNotice (Re: Notice Of Application For The Return Of the Minor Child Under The Hague Convention On The Civil Aspects Of International Child Abduction ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2023

DocketWarrant - Issued (Warrant in Lieu of Writ of Habeas Corpus ** File Copy ** )

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2023

DocketMiscellaneous (Re: Petition For A Warrant In Lieu Of A Writ Of Habeas Corpus ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2023

DocketPetition - Habeas Corpus - Family Law (RE: Petition For Return Of Minor Children To Petitioner Under The Hague Convention And Declaration Of Rosa Alarcon ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less