This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/30/2023 at 04:12:14 (UTC).

JOSE SALAZAR VS BRYAN GAW, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/25/2023 JOSE SALAZAR filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against BRYAN GAW,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1927

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SALAZAR JOSE

Defendants

ANDERSON JONATHAN

GAW BRYAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DIBA KASEY

SICHI MATTHEW

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/25/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/25/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

5/25/2023: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/25/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/25/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/25/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/26/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

6/6/2023: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Proof of Personal Service

6/7/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/7/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/8/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

6/14/2023: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

6/14/2023: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

8/1/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2023
  • DocketOn the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Jose Salazar on 06/06/2023, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Jose Salazar as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 10/18/2023 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 72 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/29/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Jose Salazar (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 72 - Hon. Joseph Lipnereffective 08/07/2023; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by: Jose Salazar (Plaintiff); As to: Bryan Gaw (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by: Jose Salazar (Plaintiff); As to: Jonathan Anderson (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 10/18/2023 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 72

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Matthew Sichi (Attorney): Organization Name changed from Finnegan & Diba to Finnegan & Diba, a Law Corporation; Middle Name: blank

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Jose Salazar (Plaintiff); As to: Bryan Gaw (Defendant); Service Date: 06/05/2023; Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • DocketAmended Complaint (1st); Filed by: Jose Salazar (Plaintiff); As to: Bryan Gaw (Defendant); Jonathan Anderson (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jose Salazar (Plaintiff); As to: Bryan Gaw (Defendant); Jonathan Anderson (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Curtis A. Kin in Department 72 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jose Salazar (Plaintiff); As to: Bryan Gaw (Defendant); Jonathan Anderson (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jose Salazar (Plaintiff); As to: Bryan Gaw (Defendant); Jonathan Anderson (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less