This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/23/2023 at 19:14:41 (UTC).

LUIS LICEA VS DEANCO HEALTHCARE, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/08/2023 LUIS LICEA filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against DEANCO HEALTHCARE, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is COLIN P. LEIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0159

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

COLIN P. LEIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LICEA LUIS

Defendant

DEANCO HEALTHCARE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FERRELL SCOTT J

KNOWLES VICTORIA CAMPBELL

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/8/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/8/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/8/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/8/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/8/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/8/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/8/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/23/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

5/23/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/24/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/7/2023: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/7/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

8/9/2023: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/10/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/10/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Case Management Statement

9/5/2023: Case Management Statement

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2024
  • Hearing03/21/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Default Prove Up Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2023
  • DocketDefault Prove Up Hearing scheduled for 03/21/2024 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 74

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 09/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 74 updated: Result Date to 09/20/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Luis Licea (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Luis Licea (Plaintiff); As to: Deanco Healthcare, LLC (Defendant); Service Cost: 79.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2023
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Luis Licea (Plaintiff); As to: Deanco Healthcare, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2023
  • DocketDefault entered as to Deanco Healthcare, LLC; On the Complaint filed by Luis Licea on 05/08/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2023
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2023
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Luis Licea (Plaintiff); As to: Deanco Healthcare, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketAddress for Scott J Ferrell (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketAddress for VICTORIA Campbell KNOWLES (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Luis Licea (Plaintiff); As to: Deanco Healthcare, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Luis Licea (Plaintiff); As to: Deanco Healthcare, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Luis Licea (Plaintiff); As to: Deanco Healthcare, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Colin P. Leis in Department 74 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less