This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/25/2023 at 06:00:42 (UTC).

NICHOLAS SPAMPINATO, AN INDIVIDUAL VS FORD MOTOR COMPANY, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/30/2023 NICHOLAS SPAMPINATO, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FORD MOTOR COMPANY, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0975

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPAMPINATO AN INDIVIDUAL NICHOLAS

Defendants

ALTEC INDUSTRIES INC. AN ALABAMA CORPORATION

FORD MOTOR COMPANY INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAELS JONATHAN A.

Defendant Attorneys

ADAMS KATHARINE HALDORSEN

FUMBARG MELISA

KEMPEN DAVID W.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/30/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/30/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Summons on Complaint

8/30/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/30/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

8/30/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

8/30/2023: First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

8/30/2023: Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/5/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

9/19/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/20/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/20/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Declaration of Demurring Party Regarding Meet and Confer

10/13/2023: Declaration of Demurring Party Regarding Meet and Confer

Answer

10/13/2023: Answer

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

10/16/2023: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Answer

10/16/2023: Answer

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

11/7/2023: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

01/16/2024

Hearing01/16/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 51 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2023

DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2023

DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 51 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 01/16/2024 08:30 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/16/2023

DocketAnswer; Filed by: Altec Industries, Inc., an Alabama corporation (Defendant); As to: Nicholas Spampinato, an individual (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/16/2023

DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by: Ford Motor Company, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/16/2023

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Stay - Removal to Federal Court

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2023

DocketAnswer; Filed by: Ford Motor Company, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Defendant); As to: Nicholas Spampinato, an individual (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2023

DocketDeclaration of Demurring Party Regarding Meet and Confer; Filed by: Southern California Edison Company, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Nicholas Spampinato, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Altec Industries, Inc., an Alabama corporation (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 09/14/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Nicholas Spampinato, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 09/14/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
09/05/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 51

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 51 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Nicholas Spampinato, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Ford Motor Company, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Defendant); Southern California Edison Company, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Altec Industries, Inc., an Alabama corporation (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Nicholas Spampinato, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Ford Motor Company, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Defendant); Southern California Edison Company, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Altec Industries, Inc., an Alabama corporation (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Nicholas Spampinato, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Ford Motor Company, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Defendant); Southern California Edison Company, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Altec Industries, Inc., an Alabama corporation (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less