This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2023 at 08:51:46 (UTC).

EMMA MOJICA, ET AL. VS CHIPOTLE MEXICAN GRILL, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/05/2023 EMMA MOJICA, filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CHIPOTLE MEXICAN GRILL, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0161

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ATILANO ANDREA

BROWN CRAIG

CORDES CALEB

CZERNER ELIZABETH

EDDIN OMAR KHAIR

FIELDS HOWARD

FRAGOMENO MARIO

GARBER KENNETH

GARCIA-LARA GUILLERMO

GILMAN CHRISTOPHER

GIRARD DYLAN

GODINEZ ROXANNA

GONZALEZ JULIO

HAN CRYSTAL

HERNANDEZ PATRICIA

HUSKISSON GREGORY

Defendants

CHIPOTLE MEXICAN GRILL INC.

CIRKS CONSTRUCTION INC. DBA KDC CONSTRUCTION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

GK MANAGEMENT CO. INC.

GRAND PROMENADE

23 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FAAL ALI

Other Attorneys

BRINTON MATTHEW L.

RYANEN ERIC I

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/5/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/5/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

5/5/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/5/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/5/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/5/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

5/15/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 05/15/2023

5/15/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 05/15/2023

Notice of Related Case

5/25/2023: Notice of Related Case

Notice of Related Case

5/30/2023: Notice of Related Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by: Emma Mojica (Plaintiff); Aaron McInnish (Non-Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by: Lisa Fink (Non-Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Deemed Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Stay - Deemed Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re: Complex Determination;)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Complex Determination;) of 05/15/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to Spring Street Courthouse in Department 9 - Hon. Yvette M. Palazuelos; Reason: Deemed Complex (Non-Class Action)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketCase assigned in Department 11 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Emma Mojica (Plaintiff); Roxanna Godinez (Plaintiff); Samer Masher (Plaintiff); Richard Zaldivar (Plaintiff); Joselito Laudencia (Plaintiff); Howard Fields (Plaintiff); Nihaar Patwardhan (Plaintiff); Judy Perez (Plaintiff); Frank Perez (Plaintiff); Elisa Ohalloran (Plaintiff); Sandra Spencer (Plaintiff); Andrea Atilano (Plaintiff); Elizabeth Czerner (Plaintiff); Crystal Han (Plaintiff); Julio Gonzalez (Plaintiff); Michael Sinram (Plaintiff); Blair Mealing (Plaintiff); Craig Brown (Plaintiff); Christopher Gilman (Plaintiff); Hovik Koloyan (Plaintiff); Guillermo Garcia-Lara (Plaintiff); David Leos (Plaintiff); Debora Zelada (Plaintiff); Omar Khair Eddin (Plaintiff); Kathleen Whalen (Plaintiff); Renee Maynard (Plaintiff); Dylan Girard (Plaintiff); Kenneth Garber (Plaintiff); Caleb Cordes (Plaintiff); Mario Fragomeno (Plaintiff); Patricia Hernandez (Plaintiff); Angie Lopera (Plaintiff); Andrew Soto (Plaintiff); Elma Maynard (Plaintiff); Gregory Huskisson (Plaintiff); K

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Emma Mojica (Plaintiff); Roxanna Godinez (Plaintiff); Samer Masher (Plaintiff); Richard Zaldivar (Plaintiff); Joselito Laudencia (Plaintiff); Howard Fields (Plaintiff); Nihaar Patwardhan (Plaintiff); Judy Perez (Plaintiff); Frank Perez (Plaintiff); Elisa Ohalloran (Plaintiff); Sandra Spencer (Plaintiff); Andrea Atilano (Plaintiff); Elizabeth Czerner (Plaintiff); Crystal Han (Plaintiff); Julio Gonzalez (Plaintiff); Michael Sinram (Plaintiff); Blair Mealing (Plaintiff); Craig Brown (Plaintiff); Christopher Gilman (Plaintiff); Hovik Koloyan (Plaintiff); Guillermo Garcia-Lara (Plaintiff); David Leos (Plaintiff); Debora Zelada (Plaintiff); Omar Khair Eddin (Plaintiff); Kathleen Whalen (Plaintiff); Renee Maynard (Plaintiff); Dylan Girard (Plaintiff); Kenneth Garber (Plaintiff); Caleb Cordes (Plaintiff); Mario Fragomeno (Plaintiff); Patricia Hernandez (Plaintiff); Angie Lopera (Plaintiff); Andrew Soto (Plaintiff); Elma Maynard (Plaintiff); Gregory Huskisson (

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Emma Mojica (Plaintiff); Roxanna Godinez (Plaintiff); Samer Masher (Plaintiff); Richard Zaldivar (Plaintiff); Joselito Laudencia (Plaintiff); Howard Fields (Plaintiff); Nihaar Patwardhan (Plaintiff); Judy Perez (Plaintiff); Frank Perez (Plaintiff); Elisa Ohalloran (Plaintiff); Sandra Spencer (Plaintiff); Andrea Atilano (Plaintiff); Elizabeth Czerner (Plaintiff); Crystal Han (Plaintiff); Julio Gonzalez (Plaintiff); Michael Sinram (Plaintiff); Blair Mealing (Plaintiff); Craig Brown (Plaintiff); Christopher Gilman (Plaintiff); Hovik Koloyan (Plaintiff); Guillermo Garcia-Lara (Plaintiff); David Leos (Plaintiff); Debora Zelada (Plaintiff); Omar Khair Eddin (Plaintiff); Kathleen Whalen (Plaintiff); Renee Maynard (Plaintiff); Dylan Girard (Plaintiff); Kenneth Garber (Plaintiff); Caleb Cordes (Plaintiff); Mario Fragomeno (Plaintiff); Patricia Hernandez (Plaintiff); Angie Lopera (Plaintiff); Andrew Soto (Plaintiff); Elma Maynard (Plaintiff); Gregory Hu

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less