This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2023 at 10:26:39 (UTC).

ARTHUR HUTTON VS CYLINDER ENTERPRISES, INC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/26/2023 ARTHUR HUTTON filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against CYLINDER ENTERPRISES, INC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0589

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HUTTON ARTHUR

Defendants

BARRETT BUSINESS SERVICES INC.

CYLINDER ENTERPRISES INC DBA FINISH LINE TOWING AND TRANSPORT

TORNO MARK

VONRANZOW PAUL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CUMMINGS SCOTT OHARA

FRANCK LEE KENNETH

 

Court Documents

Complaint

4/26/2023: Complaint

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

4/26/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/26/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/26/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/26/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

4/26/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

4/26/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/27/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

5/5/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/22/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/22/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2024
  • Hearing01/24/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 200 West Compton Blvd., Compton, CA 90220; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Arthur Hutton (Plaintiff); As to: Paul Vonranzow (Defendant); Service Cost: 48.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Arthur Hutton (Plaintiff); As to: Mark Torno (Defendant); Service Cost: 89.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Arthur Hutton (Plaintiff); As to: Cylinder Enterprises, Inc (Defendant); Service Date: 05/02/2023; Service Cost: 125.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Fumiko Wasserman in Department B Compton Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/24/2024 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Arthur Hutton (Plaintiff); As to: Cylinder Enterprises, Inc (Defendant); Barrett Business Services, Inc., (Defendant); Mark Torno (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Arthur Hutton (Plaintiff); As to: Cylinder Enterprises, Inc (Defendant); Barrett Business Services, Inc., (Defendant); Mark Torno (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Arthur Hutton (Plaintiff); As to: Cylinder Enterprises, Inc (Defendant); Barrett Business Services, Inc., (Defendant); Mark Torno (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less