This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/24/2023 at 07:26:12 (UTC).

ARTHUR HUTTON VS CYLINDER ENTERPRISES, INC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/26/2023 ARTHUR HUTTON filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against CYLINDER ENTERPRISES, INC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is FUMIKO WASSERMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0589

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

FUMIKO WASSERMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HUTTON ARTHUR

Defendants

BARRETT BUSINESS SERVICES INC.

CYLINDER ENTERPRISES INC DBA FINISH LINE TOWING AND TRANSPORT

TORNO MARK

VONRANZOW PAUL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FRANCK LEE KENNETH

CUMMINGS SCOTT OHARA

Defendant Attorney

FOX MARTIN R.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

9/21/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration)

9/14/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration)

Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration) of 09/14/2023

9/14/2023: Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration) of 09/14/2023

Reply (name extension) DEFENDANTS’ REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

9/7/2023: Reply (name extension) DEFENDANTS’ REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

Declaration (name extension) Declaration of Arthur Hutton In Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration

8/31/2023: Declaration (name extension) Declaration of Arthur Hutton In Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration

Opposition (name extension) Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration

8/31/2023: Opposition (name extension) Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration

Declaration (name extension) Declaration OF PAUL VONRANZOW IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

7/7/2023: Declaration (name extension) Declaration OF PAUL VONRANZOW IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

Declaration (name extension) Declaration OF SCOTT E. SHAPIRO IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

7/7/2023: Declaration (name extension) Declaration OF SCOTT E. SHAPIRO IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

Declaration (name extension) Declaration OF MARK TORNOW IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

7/7/2023: Declaration (name extension) Declaration OF MARK TORNOW IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

Motion to Compel Arbitration

7/7/2023: Motion to Compel Arbitration

Answer

6/8/2023: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/22/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/22/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/5/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/27/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

4/26/2023: First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

4/26/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Summons Summons on Complaint

4/26/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/13/2024

Hearing09/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 200 West Compton Blvd., Compton, CA 90220; Post-Arbitration Status Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023

DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Arthur Hutton (Plaintiff); As to: Barrett Business Services, Inc., (Defendant); Service Date: 05/01/2023; Service Cost: 153.75; Service Cost Waived: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023

DocketPost-Arbitration Status Conference scheduled for 09/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department B

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Stay - Binding Arbitration

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/24/2024 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department B Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/24/2024

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023

DocketUpdated -- Motion to Compel Arbitration: Filed By: Cylinder Enterprises, Inc (Defendant); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 09/14/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023

DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023

DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration) of 09/14/2023; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023

DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration scheduled for 09/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department B updated: Result Date to 09/14/2023; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023

DocketDEFENDANTS REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS; Filed by: Cylinder Enterprises, Inc (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
04/27/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Fumiko Wasserman in Department B Compton Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/24/2024 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department B

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2023

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Arthur Hutton (Plaintiff); As to: Cylinder Enterprises, Inc (Defendant); Barrett Business Services, Inc., (Defendant); Mark Torno (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Arthur Hutton (Plaintiff); As to: Cylinder Enterprises, Inc (Defendant); Barrett Business Services, Inc., (Defendant); Mark Torno (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Arthur Hutton (Plaintiff); As to: Cylinder Enterprises, Inc (Defendant); Barrett Business Services, Inc., (Defendant); Mark Torno (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less