This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/09/2023 at 00:32:30 (UTC).

CHARLES EMMETT SINGLETON III VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/11/2023 CHARLES EMMETT SINGLETON III filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Beverly Hills Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1583

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SINGLETON III CHARLES EMMETT

Defendants

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

CNM COMMUNICATIONS INC.

GTE COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS CORPORATION

VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KLEEGER KENNETH

 

Court Documents

Complaint

4/11/2023: Complaint

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

4/11/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/11/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/11/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/11/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

4/11/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

4/11/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/12/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

7/17/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2023
  • Hearing10/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 207 at 9355 Burton Way, Beverly Hills, CA 90210; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to Beverly Hills Courthouse in Department 207 - Hon. Michael E. Whitaker; Reason: Transfer for Reassignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Helen Zukin in Department 207 Beverly Hills Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 10/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Beverly Hills Courthouse at Department 207

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Charles Emmett Singleton III (Plaintiff); As to: City of Los Angeles (Defendant); Verizon Communications, Inc (Defendant); GTE Communications Systems Corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Charles Emmett Singleton III (Plaintiff); As to: City of Los Angeles (Defendant); Verizon Communications, Inc (Defendant); GTE Communications Systems Corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Charles Emmett Singleton III (Plaintiff); As to: City of Los Angeles (Defendant); Verizon Communications, Inc (Defendant); GTE Communications Systems Corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less