This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/30/2023 at 14:35:55 (UTC).

SARENEH HACOPI VS DAMON KIRSCHE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/14/2023 SARENEH HACOPI filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DAMON KIRSCHE,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2128

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HACOPI SARENEH

Defendants

EAN HOLDING LLC

KIRSCHE DAMON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROCK CAMERON Y

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/14/2023: Complaint

Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

9/14/2023: Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/14/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/14/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Summons on Complaint

9/14/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/14/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

9/14/2023: First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/15/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

02/14/2024

Hearing02/14/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Case Management Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Frank M. Tavelman in Department A Burbank Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/14/2024 at 08:30 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department A

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Sareneh Hacopi (Plaintiff); As to: Damon Kirsche (Defendant); EAN Holding, LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Sareneh Hacopi (Plaintiff); As to: Damon Kirsche (Defendant); EAN Holding, LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Sareneh Hacopi (Plaintiff); As to: Damon Kirsche (Defendant); EAN Holding, LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less