This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/13/2023 at 00:14:56 (UTC).

CLEAR BLUE INSURANCE CO., VS B&G REALTY, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/09/2023 CLEAR BLUE INSURANCE CO , filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against B G REALTY, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9038

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CLEAR BLUE INSURANCE CO.

Defendants

AILYN ZABALETA A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM YEHINI CAMACHO

ANGIE TEAPILA A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM VIRIDIANA HERRERA

ANTHONY RIVERA CHAVEZ A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM DARLYN MEJIA CHAVEZ

BILLY VASQUEZ AN INDIVIDUAL

CARLOS VASQUEZ A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM REYNA FRANCO

DAARALYN PARRA A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM PATZY JULIANA ARIAS RUIZ

DANIEL JERONIMO A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM AMALIA RAMOS

DEANDRAA PARRA A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM PATZY JULIANA ARIAS RUIZ

DEANE HERRERA A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM VIRIDIANA HERRERA

DEILANY ZABALETA A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM YEHINI CAMACHO

DENISSE GUERRERO A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM REYNA FRANCO

50 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PRESS MICHELLE R.

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

8/9/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/9/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

8/9/2023: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/9/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

8/9/2023: First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

8/9/2023: Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/16/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons Summons on Complaint

8/28/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

Amended Complaint Amended Complaint (1st)

8/28/2023: Amended Complaint Amended Complaint (1st)

 

Docket Entries

12/13/2023

Hearing12/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 52 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CLEAR BLUE INSURANCE CO., (Plaintiff); As to: B&G REALTY, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); DANIEL JERONIMO, an individual (Defendant); AMALIA RAMOS, an individual (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023

DocketAmended Complaint (1st); Filed by: CLEAR BLUE INSURANCE CO., (Plaintiff); As to: B&G REALTY, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); DANIEL JERONIMO, an individual (Defendant); AMALIA RAMOS, an individual (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 12/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 52

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Armen Tamzarian in Department 52 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: CLEAR BLUE INSURANCE CO., (Plaintiff); As to: B&G REALTY, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); DANIEL JERONIMO, an individual (Defendant); AMALIA RAMOS, an individual (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CLEAR BLUE INSURANCE CO., (Plaintiff); As to: B&G REALTY, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); DANIEL JERONIMO, an individual (Defendant); AMALIA RAMOS, an individual (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less