This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/26/2023 at 01:02:53 (UTC).

JEFFREY HAWKINS VS MEDICAL DEVICE BUSINESS SERVICES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/05/2023 JEFFREY HAWKINS filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against MEDICAL DEVICE BUSINESS SERVICES, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT and DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5572

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HAWKINS JEFFREY

Defendants

JOHNSON & JOHNSON SERVICES INC.

THOMAS P. SCHMALZRIED M.D.

MEDICAL DEVICE BUSINESS SERVICES INC. FKA MEDICAL DEVICE BUSINESS SERVICES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOKE CURTIS GEORGE

Defendant Attorneys

NORTON CHRISTOPHER P.

OLAH KELLEY S.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

11/20/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

11/20/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

11/17/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/17/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/17/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

9/29/2023: Answer

Notice (name extension) Notice AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT-CIVIL

9/1/2023: Notice (name extension) Notice AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT-CIVIL

Notice (name extension) Notice OF ORDERS AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/31/2023: Notice (name extension) Notice OF ORDERS AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/22/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court) of 08/18/2023

8/18/2023: Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court) of 08/18/2023

Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court)

8/18/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court)

Answer

8/16/2023: Answer

Answer

8/16/2023: Answer

Objection (name extension) Objection of Defendants Medical Device Business Services, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc. to Complex Determination

8/15/2023: Objection (name extension) Objection of Defendants Medical Device Business Services, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc. to Complex Determination

Objection (name extension) Objection Objection to Case Being Deemed Complex, Coordinated, Consolidated, or Related

8/15/2023: Objection (name extension) Objection Objection to Case Being Deemed Complex, Coordinated, Consolidated, or Related

Minute Order Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Complex Determination)

8/14/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Complex Determination)

Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Complex Determination) of 08/14/2023

8/14/2023: Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Complex Determination) of 08/14/2023

Notice of OSC (Name Extension) Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Complex Determination

7/26/2023: Notice of OSC (Name Extension) Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Complex Determination

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

12/05/2023

Hearing12/05/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/20/2023

DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Jeffrey Hawkins (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/20/2023

DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Thomas P. Schmalzried, M.D. (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/17/2023

DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Depuy Orthopaedics, Inc. Erroneously Sued As Medical Device Business Services, Inc. (Defendant); Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc. (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/17/2023

DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc. (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/17/2023

DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Depuy Orthopaedics, Inc. Erroneously Sued As Medical Device Business Services, Inc. (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023

DocketAnswer; Filed by: Thomas P. Schmalzried, M.D. (Defendant); As to: Jeffrey Hawkins (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2023

DocketNotice AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT-CIVIL; Filed by: Jeffrey Hawkins (Plaintiff); As to: Thomas P. Schmalzried, M.D. (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2023

DocketNotice OF ORDERS AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed by: Jeffrey Hawkins (Plaintiff); As to: Depuy Orthopaedics, Inc. Erroneously Sued As Medical Device Business Services, Inc. (Defendant); Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc. (Defendant); Thomas P. Schmalzried, M.D. (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
07/26/2023

DocketProof of Service Summons; Filed by: Jeffrey Hawkins (Plaintiff); As to: Medical Device Business Services, Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 07/17/2023; Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2023

DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Complex Determination; Filed by: Jeffrey Hawkins (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2023

DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by: Jeffrey Hawkins (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Complex Determination scheduled for 08/14/2023 at 01:45 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 11

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023

DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Setting Case for Hearing;) of 07/12/2023; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023

DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re: Setting Case for Hearing;)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jeffrey Hawkins (Plaintiff); As to: Medical Device Business Services, Inc. (Defendant); Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc. (Defendant); Thomas P. Schmalzried, M.D. (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jeffrey Hawkins (Plaintiff); As to: Medical Device Business Services, Inc. (Defendant); Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc. (Defendant); Thomas P. Schmalzried, M.D. (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023

DocketCase assigned in Department 11 Spring Street Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less