This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/17/2023 at 00:58:46 (UTC).

ZAVALETA, FRANCISCO CANEDO VS VIILA, ERIKA LISBETH CHAVARRIA

Case Summary

On 02/15/2023 ZAVALETA, FRANCISCO CANEDO filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against VIILA, ERIKA LISBETH CHAVARRIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KAUFMAN, SHELLEY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0001

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KAUFMAN, SHELLEY

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ZAVALETA FRANCISCO CANEDO

Respondent

VIILA ERIKA LISBETH CHAVARRIA

Not Classified By Court

GASCON GEORGE - District Attorney

 

Court Documents

Petition - Habeas Corpus - Family Law - RE: PETITTION FOR RETURN OF MINOR CHILDREN TO PETITIONER UNDER THE HAGUE CONVENTION AND DECLARATION OF ROSA ALARCON

2/15/2023: Petition - Habeas Corpus - Family Law - RE: PETITTION FOR RETURN OF MINOR CHILDREN TO PETITIONER UNDER THE HAGUE CONVENTION AND DECLARATION OF ROSA ALARCON

Miscellaneous - RE: PETITION FOR A WARRANT IN LIEU OF A WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS

2/15/2023: Miscellaneous - RE: PETITION FOR A WARRANT IN LIEU OF A WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS

Notice - OF APPLICATION FOR THE RETURN OF THE MINOR CHILDREN UNDER THE CIVIL ASPECTS OF INTERNATIONAL CHILD ABDUCTION

2/15/2023: Notice - OF APPLICATION FOR THE RETURN OF THE MINOR CHILDREN UNDER THE CIVIL ASPECTS OF INTERNATIONAL CHILD ABDUCTION

Miscellaneous - RE: MEMORANDUM OF LAW: THE CONVENTION ON THE CIVIL ASPECTS OF INTERNATIONAL CHILD ABDUCTION DONE AT HAGUE, Oct. 25, 1980; -and- THE INTERNATIONALCHILD ABDUCTION REMEDIES ACT, 22 U.S.C

2/15/2023: Miscellaneous - RE: MEMORANDUM OF LAW: THE CONVENTION ON THE CIVIL ASPECTS OF INTERNATIONAL CHILD ABDUCTION DONE AT HAGUE, Oct. 25, 1980; -and- THE INTERNATIONALCHILD ABDUCTION REMEDIES ACT, 22 U.S.C

Warrant - Issued - Warrant in Lieu of Writ of Habeas Corpus.

2/15/2023: Warrant - Issued - Warrant in Lieu of Writ of Habeas Corpus.

Miscellaneous - RE: POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EXPEDITED PROCESSINGS UNDER THE HAGUE CONVENTION ON THE CIVIL ASPECTS OF INTERNATIONAL CHILD ABDUCTION

2/15/2023: Miscellaneous - RE: POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EXPEDITED PROCESSINGS UNDER THE HAGUE CONVENTION ON THE CIVIL ASPECTS OF INTERNATIONAL CHILD ABDUCTION

Declaration - of Senior Investigator Claudia Rodriguera

3/23/2023: Declaration - of Senior Investigator Claudia Rodriguera

Protective Custody Warrant - Issued

3/23/2023: Protective Custody Warrant - Issued

Minute Order

3/29/2023: Minute Order

Proof of Service

3/29/2023: Proof of Service

Minute Order

4/21/2023: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

04/21/2023

Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 2, Kaufman, Shelley, Presiding; Habeas Corpus Hearing - Held - Case Dismissed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2023

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/29/2023

Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Kaufman, Shelley, Presiding; Habeas Corpus Hearing - Held - Continued

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/29/2023

DocketProof of Service; Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/29/2023

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2023

DocketDeclaration (of Senior Investigator Claudia Rodriguera )

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2023

DocketProtective Custody Warrant - Issued

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2023

DocketPetition - Habeas Corpus - Family Law (RE: PETITTION FOR RETURN OF MINOR CHILDREN TO PETITIONER UNDER THE HAGUE CONVENTION AND DECLARATION OF ROSA ALARCON ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2023

DocketMiscellaneous (RE: PETITION FOR A WARRANT IN LIEU OF A WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2023

DocketMiscellaneous (RE: POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EXPEDITED PROCESSINGS UNDER THE HAGUE CONVENTION ON THE CIVIL ASPECTS OF INTERNATIONAL CHILD ABDUCTION ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2023

DocketNotice (OF APPLICATION FOR THE RETURN OF THE MINOR CHILDREN UNDER THE CIVIL ASPECTS OF INTERNATIONAL CHILD ABDUCTION ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2023

DocketWarrant - Issued (Warrant in Lieu of Writ of Habeas Corpus. )

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2023

DocketMiscellaneous (RE: MEMORANDUM OF LAW: THE CONVENTION ON THE CIVIL ASPECTS OF INTERNATIONAL CHILD ABDUCTION DONE AT HAGUE, Oct. 25, 1980; -and- THE INTERNATIONALCHILD ABDUCTION REMEDIES ACT, 22 U.S.C. 9001, et. seq. ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less