This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/01/2023 at 12:07:08 (UTC).

PINA AGUIRRE, MICHAEL JACQUELINE VS HERNANDEZ, MARIO

Case Summary

On 04/20/2023 PINA AGUIRRE, MICHAEL JACQUELINE filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against HERNANDEZ, MARIO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KAUFMAN, SHELLEY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0003

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KAUFMAN, SHELLEY

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PINA AGUIRRE MICHAEL JACQUELINE

Respondent

HERNANDEZ MARIO

Not Classified By Court

GASCON GEORGE - District Attorney

 

Court Documents

Miscellaneous - RE: WARRANT IN LIEU OF WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS

4/20/2023: Miscellaneous - RE: WARRANT IN LIEU OF WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS

Miscellaneous - RE: PETITION FOR A WARRANT IN LIEU OF A WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS

4/20/2023: Miscellaneous - RE: PETITION FOR A WARRANT IN LIEU OF A WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS

Notice - RE: NOTICE OF APPLICATION FOR THE RETURN OF THE MINOR CHILD UNDER THA HAGUE CONVENTION ON THE CIVIL ASPECTS OF INTERNATIONAL CHILD ABDUCTION

4/20/2023: Notice - RE: NOTICE OF APPLICATION FOR THE RETURN OF THE MINOR CHILD UNDER THA HAGUE CONVENTION ON THE CIVIL ASPECTS OF INTERNATIONAL CHILD ABDUCTION

Miscellaneous - RE:MEMORANDUM OF LAW: THE CONVENTION ON THE CIVIL ASPECTS OF INTERNATIONAL CHILD ABDUCTION, DONE AT THE HAGUE, OCT. 25, 1980; -AND- THE INTERNATIONAL CHILD ABDUCTION REMEDIES ACT, 22 U

4/20/2023: Miscellaneous - RE:MEMORANDUM OF LAW: THE CONVENTION ON THE CIVIL ASPECTS OF INTERNATIONAL CHILD ABDUCTION, DONE AT THE HAGUE, OCT. 25, 1980; -AND- THE INTERNATIONAL CHILD ABDUCTION REMEDIES ACT, 22 U

Miscellaneous - RE:POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EXPEDITED PROCEEDINGS UNDER THE HAGUE CONVENTION ON THE CIVIL ASPECTS OF INTERNATIONAL CHILD ABDUCTION

4/20/2023: Miscellaneous - RE:POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EXPEDITED PROCEEDINGS UNDER THE HAGUE CONVENTION ON THE CIVIL ASPECTS OF INTERNATIONAL CHILD ABDUCTION

Miscellaneous - RE: WARRANT IN LEIU OF WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS

4/20/2023: Miscellaneous - RE: WARRANT IN LEIU OF WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS

Petition - Habeas Corpus - Family Law - RE: PETITION FOR RETURN OF MINOR CHILD TO PETITIONER UNDER THE HAGUE CONVENTION AND DECLARATION OF ROSA ALARCON

4/20/2023: Petition - Habeas Corpus - Family Law - RE: PETITION FOR RETURN OF MINOR CHILD TO PETITIONER UNDER THE HAGUE CONVENTION AND DECLARATION OF ROSA ALARCON

Minute Order

6/21/2023: Minute Order

Miscellaneous - Petition for a Warrant in Lieu of Writ of Habeas Corpus

7/10/2023: Miscellaneous - Petition for a Warrant in Lieu of Writ of Habeas Corpus

Warrant - Issued - Warrant in Lieu of Writ of Habeas Corpus ** File Copy **

7/10/2023: Warrant - Issued - Warrant in Lieu of Writ of Habeas Corpus ** File Copy **

Minute Order

7/19/2023: Minute Order

Proof of Service - electronic- Notice of Ruling

8/29/2023: Proof of Service - electronic- Notice of Ruling

Proof of Service - electronic - Notice of Ruling

8/29/2023: Proof of Service - electronic - Notice of Ruling

Notice - Ruling - From 7/19/2023

8/29/2023: Notice - Ruling - From 7/19/2023

Proof of Service - Mail - Notice of Ruling

8/29/2023: Proof of Service - Mail - Notice of Ruling

Minute Order

8/29/2023: Minute Order

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/29/2023

Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Kaufman, Shelley, Presiding; Habeas Corpus Hearing - Held - Case Dismissed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2023

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2023

DocketProof of Service - Mail (Notice of Ruling ); Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2023

DocketProof of Service (electronic- Notice of Ruling ); Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2023

DocketProof of Service (electronic - Notice of Ruling ); Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2023

DocketNotice - Ruling (From 7/19/2023 ); Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023

DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023

DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023

DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023

DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
06/21/2023

Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 2, Kaufman, Shelley, Presiding; Habeas Corpus Hearing - Held - Continued

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2023

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2023

DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/20/2023

DocketMiscellaneous (RE:MEMORANDUM OF LAW: THE CONVENTION ON THE CIVIL ASPECTS OF INTERNATIONAL CHILD ABDUCTION, DONE AT THE HAGUE, OCT. 25, 1980; -AND- THE INTERNATIONAL CHILD ABDUCTION REMEDIES ACT, 22 U.S.C. 9001, ET. SEQ. ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/20/2023

DocketMiscellaneous (RE: WARRANT IN LIEU OF WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/20/2023

DocketNotice (RE: NOTICE OF APPLICATION FOR THE RETURN OF THE MINOR CHILD UNDER THA HAGUE CONVENTION ON THE CIVIL ASPECTS OF INTERNATIONAL CHILD ABDUCTION ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/20/2023

DocketMiscellaneous (RE: PETITION FOR A WARRANT IN LIEU OF A WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/20/2023

DocketMiscellaneous (RE: WARRANT IN LEIU OF WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/20/2023

DocketMiscellaneous (RE:POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EXPEDITED PROCEEDINGS UNDER THE HAGUE CONVENTION ON THE CIVIL ASPECTS OF INTERNATIONAL CHILD ABDUCTION ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/20/2023

DocketPetition - Habeas Corpus - Family Law (RE: PETITION FOR RETURN OF MINOR CHILD TO PETITIONER UNDER THE HAGUE CONVENTION AND DECLARATION OF ROSA ALARCON ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less