This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/12/2023 at 09:28:06 (UTC).

PAWNEE LEASING CORPORATION VS LANE PRODUCTS, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/17/2023 PAWNEE LEASING CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LANE PRODUCTS, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1438

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PAWNEE LEASING CORPORATION

Defendants

BILLINGSLEA LARRY LEE AKA LARRY BILLINGLEY

BILLINGSLEY DARIA

LANE PRODUCTS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FERNS BARRY

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/17/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Complaint

5/17/2023: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/17/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/17/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/17/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/17/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/17/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/17/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Proof of Personal Service

7/10/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/10/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/11/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

7/26/2023: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2024
  • Hearing03/12/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department F47 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Pawnee Leasing Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Daria Billingsley (Defendant); Service Date: 07/18/2023; Service Cost: 258.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Pawnee Leasing Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Lane Products, Inc. (Defendant); Larry Lee Billingslea (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • DocketDefault entered as to Lane Products, Inc. Larry Lee Billingslea; On the Complaint filed by Pawnee Leasing Corporation on 05/17/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Pawnee Leasing Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Lane Products, Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 05/26/2023; Service Cost: 78.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Pawnee Leasing Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Larry Lee Billingslea (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 05/25/2023; Service Cost: 108.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Pawnee Leasing Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Lane Products, Inc. (Defendant); Larry Lee Billingslea (Defendant); Daria Billingsley (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Melvin D. Sandvig in Department F47 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Pawnee Leasing Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Lane Products, Inc. (Defendant); Larry Lee Billingslea (Defendant); Daria Billingsley (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Pawnee Leasing Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Lane Products, Inc. (Defendant); Larry Lee Billingslea (Defendant); Daria Billingsley (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/12/2024 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F47

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less