*******1438
05/17/2023
Pending - Other Pending
Contract - Other Contract
Los Angeles, California
PAWNEE LEASING CORPORATION
BILLINGSLEA LARRY LEE AKA LARRY BILLINGLEY
BILLINGSLEY DARIA
LANE PRODUCTS INC.
FERNS BARRY
5/17/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference
5/17/2023: Complaint
5/17/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
5/17/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet
5/17/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
5/17/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet
5/17/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING
5/17/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET
7/10/2023: Proof of Personal Service
7/10/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
7/11/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
7/26/2023: Proof of Personal Service
Hearing03/12/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department F47 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Case Management Conference
[-] Read LessDocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Pawnee Leasing Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Daria Billingsley (Defendant); Service Date: 07/18/2023; Service Cost: 258.00; Service Cost Waived: No
[-] Read LessDocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Pawnee Leasing Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Lane Products, Inc. (Defendant); Larry Lee Billingslea (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketDefault entered as to Lane Products, Inc. Larry Lee Billingslea; On the Complaint filed by Pawnee Leasing Corporation on 05/17/2023
[-] Read LessDocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Pawnee Leasing Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Lane Products, Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 05/26/2023; Service Cost: 78.00; Service Cost Waived: No
[-] Read LessDocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Pawnee Leasing Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Larry Lee Billingslea (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 05/25/2023; Service Cost: 108.00; Service Cost Waived: No
[-] Read LessDocketComplaint; Filed by: Pawnee Leasing Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Lane Products, Inc. (Defendant); Larry Lee Billingslea (Defendant); Daria Billingsley (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketCase assigned to Hon. Melvin D. Sandvig in Department F47 Chatsworth Courthouse
[-] Read LessDocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Pawnee Leasing Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Lane Products, Inc. (Defendant); Larry Lee Billingslea (Defendant); Daria Billingsley (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Pawnee Leasing Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Lane Products, Inc. (Defendant); Larry Lee Billingslea (Defendant); Daria Billingsley (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/12/2024 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F47
[-] Read Less