This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/17/2023 at 01:53:40 (UTC).

COMERICA BANK VS VITALIY TSOY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/13/2023 COMERICA BANK filed an Other lawsuit against VITALIY TSOY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4041

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COMERICA BANK

Defendants

DTOX DAY SPA INC.

TSOY DAY SPA INC.

TSOY VITALIY

WELLS FARGO BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

COGAN EFRAT M.

LOTT CHERYL MARIE

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/13/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/13/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Summons on Complaint

9/13/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/13/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/13/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

9/13/2023: First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

9/13/2023: Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/13/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Declaration (name extension) Civil Trust Deposit Interpleader Funds $102,412.05c

9/27/2023: Declaration (name extension) Civil Trust Deposit Interpleader Funds $102,412.05c

 

Docket Entries

01/31/2024

Hearing01/31/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023

DocketCivil Trust Deposit Interpleader Funds $102,412.05c; Filed by: COMERICA BANK (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: COMERICA BANK (Plaintiff); As to: VITALIY TSOY (Defendant); TSOY DAY SPA, INC. (Defendant); DTOX DAY SPA, INC. (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Huey P. Cotton in Department A Van Nuys Courthouse East

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: COMERICA BANK (Plaintiff); As to: VITALIY TSOY (Defendant); TSOY DAY SPA, INC. (Defendant); DTOX DAY SPA, INC. (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: COMERICA BANK (Plaintiff); As to: VITALIY TSOY (Defendant); TSOY DAY SPA, INC. (Defendant); DTOX DAY SPA, INC. (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/31/2024 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department A

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less