This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/04/2023 at 17:45:42 (UTC).

SAMUEL HIDALGO, AN INDIVIDUAL VS MAURICIO DE JESUS MARTINEZ LOPEZ, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/30/2023 SAMUEL HIDALGO, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MAURICIO DE JESUS MARTINEZ LOPEZ, AN INDIVIDUAL,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2082

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HIDALGO AN INDIVIDUAL SAMUEL

Defendants

DE JESUS MARTINEZ LOPEZ AN INDIVIDUAL MAURICIO

HOME DEPOT U.S.A. INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEDEZMA FLORES JORGE

 

Court Documents

Unknown - EIGHTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

5/30/2023: Unknown - EIGHTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/30/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/30/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

5/30/2023: Complaint

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

5/30/2023: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/30/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/30/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/30/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2025
  • Hearing05/27/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2024
  • Hearing11/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2024
  • Hearing11/12/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Samuel Hidalgo, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Mauricio De Jesus Martinez Lopez, an individual (Defendant); Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 05/27/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Kerry Bensinger in Department 27 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Samuel Hidalgo, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Mauricio De Jesus Martinez Lopez, an individual (Defendant); Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Samuel Hidalgo, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Mauricio De Jesus Martinez Lopez, an individual (Defendant); Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketEighth Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 11/12/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less