This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/19/2023 at 07:21:56 (UTC).

MARIA DEL LA LUZ LOPEZ MALDONADO VS PACIFIC SHORES INVESTMENT GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION INDIVIDUALLY

Case Summary

On 05/08/2023 MARIA DEL LA LUZ LOPEZ MALDONADO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against PACIFIC SHORES INVESTMENT GROUP, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION INDIVIDUALLY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0225

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOPEZ MALDONADO MARIA DEL LA LUZ

Defendant

PACIFIC SHORES INVESTMENT GROUP INC. DBA HARBOR LAUNDRY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LIPELES KEVIN A.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/8/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/8/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/8/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/8/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/8/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/8/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/8/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/15/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/23/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/3/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2023
  • Hearing09/08/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 31 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Maria Del La Luz Lopez Maldonado (Plaintiff); As to: Pacific Shores Investment Group, Inc. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 05/15/2023; Service Cost: 64.90; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Maria Del La Luz Lopez Maldonado (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Case Management Conference: As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Pacific Shores Investment Group, Inc. (Defendant): Organization Name changed from Pacific Shores Investment Group, Inc., a California corporation individually to Pacific Shores Investment Group, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketAddress for Kevin A. Lipeles (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 09/08/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Maria Del La Luz Lopez Maldonado (Plaintiff); As to: Pacific Shores Investment Group, Inc., a California corporation individually (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Maria Del La Luz Lopez Maldonado (Plaintiff); As to: Pacific Shores Investment Group, Inc., a California corporation individually (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Maria Del La Luz Lopez Maldonado (Plaintiff); As to: Pacific Shores Investment Group, Inc., a California corporation individually (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 31 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less