This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/16/2023 at 02:36:17 (UTC).

JANET HILL VS KTLA, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/21/2023 JANET HILL filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against KTLA, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTOPHER K. LUI. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8916

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HILL JANET

Defendants

BALL JASON

KTLA LLC

NEXSTAR MEDIA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GHOZLAND JENNIFER L.

Defendant Attorney

CHARLES KATESSA M

 

Court Documents

Complaint

4/21/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/21/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Summons on Complaint

4/21/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/21/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

4/21/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

4/21/2023: First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

4/21/2023: Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

5/9/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/9/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

6/13/2023: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/14/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

7/11/2023: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Notice to Adverse Party and to the Superior C...) of 07/13/2023

7/13/2023: Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Notice to Adverse Party and to the Superior C...) of 07/13/2023

Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order Re: Notice to Adverse Party and to the Superior C...)

7/13/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order Re: Notice to Adverse Party and to the Superior C...)

Notice (name extension) Notice to Adverse Party and to the Superior Court of Removal to Federal Court Under 28 U.S.C. . §§ 1332 and 1441 (a) and (b) (Diversity)

7/13/2023: Notice (name extension) Notice to Adverse Party and to the Superior Court of Removal to Federal Court Under 28 U.S.C. . §§ 1332 and 1441 (a) and (b) (Diversity)

Minute Order Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Status of Remand Order)

10/13/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Status of Remand Order)

Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Status of Remand Order) of 10/13/2023

10/13/2023: Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Status of Remand Order) of 10/13/2023

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/13/2023

DocketMinute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Status of Remand Order)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2023

DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Status of Remand Order) of 10/13/2023; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2023

DocketNon-Appearance Case Review Re: Status of Remand Order scheduled for 10/13/2023 at 11:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 76 updated: Result Date to 10/13/2023; Result Type to Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2023

DocketCase is Deemed Complete.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2023

DocketNotice TO ADVERSE PARTY AND TO THE SUPERIOR COURT OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1332 AND 1441 (a) (DIVERSITY); Filed by: Nexstar Media Inc. (Defendant); Jason Ball (Defendant); As to: Janet Hill (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2023

DocketUpdated -- Notice to Adverse Party and to the Superior Court of Removal to Federal Court Under 28 U.S.C. . 1332 and 1441 (a) (DIVERSITY): Name Extension changed from TO ADVERSE PARTY AND TO THE SUPERIOR COURT OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1332 AND 1441 (a) (DIVERSITY) to to Adverse Party and to the Superior Court of Removal to Federal Court Under 28 U.S.C. . 1332 and 1441 (a) (DIVERSITY) ; As To Parties changed from Janet Hill (Plaintiff) to Janet Hill (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2023

DocketUpdated -- Notice to Adverse Party and to the Superior Court of Removal to Federal Court Under 28 U.S.C. . 1332 and 1441 (a) and (b) (Diversity): Name Extension changed from to Adverse Party and to the Superior Court of Removal to Federal Court Under 28 U.S.C. . 1332 and 1441 (a) (DIVERSITY) to to Adverse Party and to the Superior Court of Removal to Federal Court Under 28 U.S.C. . 1332 and 1441 (a) and (b) (Diversity) ; As To Parties changed from Janet Hill (Plaintiff) to Janet Hill (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2023

DocketNon-Appearance Case Review Re: Status of Remand Order scheduled for 10/13/2023 at 11:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 76

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2023

DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re: Notice to Adverse Party and to the Superior C...)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2023

DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Notice to Adverse Party and to the Superior C...) of 07/13/2023; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
04/21/2023

DocketUpdated -- Civil Case Cover Sheet: As To Parties changed from JASON BALL (Defendant), NEXSTAR MEDIA INC. a Delaware Corporation (Defendant), KTLA, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant) to Nexstar Media Inc. (Defendant), KTLA, LLC (Defendant), Jason Ball (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2023

DocketUpdated -- Jennifer L. Ghozland (Attorney): Organization Name changed from Ghozland Law Firm, p.c. to Ghozland Law Firm, P.C. Middle Name changed from Lynn to L.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2023

DocketAddress for Jennifer L. Ghozland (Attorney) updated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2023

DocketUpdated -- Summons on Complaint: As To Parties changed from NEXSTAR MEDIA INC. a Delaware Corporation (Defendant), JASON BALL (Defendant), KTLA, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant) to Nexstar Media Inc. (Defendant), Jason Ball (Defendant), KTLA, LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2023

DocketUpdated -- Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet: As To Parties:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2023

DocketUpdated -- First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing: As To Parties:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2023

DocketUpdated -- Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet: As To Parties:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2023

DocketUpdated -- Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case: As To Parties:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: JANET HILL (Plaintiff); As to: KTLA, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant); NEXSTAR MEDIA INC. a Delaware Corporation (Defendant); JASON BALL (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: JANET HILL (Plaintiff); As to: KTLA, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant); NEXSTAR MEDIA INC. a Delaware Corporation (Defendant); JASON BALL (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less