This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/05/2023 at 00:25:09 (UTC).

JASMYNE HESTER VS BAMIA 2 LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/07/2023 JASMYNE HESTER filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against BAMIA 2 LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8690

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HESTER JASMYNE

Defendants

BAMIA 2 LLC

KAUFMAN MARK

LAST NAME UNKNOWN ISIAH

REEF GLOBAL HOLDINGS INC.

REEF GLOBAL INC.

REEF GLOBAL LLC

REEF PARKING ENTERPRISES LLC

REEF TECHNOLOGY INC.

ST. BERNARD PAUL

THE WENDY?S COMPANY

WENDY?S INTERNATIONAL INC.

WENDY?S INTERNATIONAL LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FRANCK LEE KENNETH

CUMMINGS SCOTT OHARA

 

Court Documents

Notice (name extension) Notice OF FILING OF PROOF OF SERVICE SERVING REEF GLOBAL INC., VIA CERTIFIED MAIL, PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 415.40 AND 416.10

9/28/2023: Notice (name extension) Notice OF FILING OF PROOF OF SERVICE SERVING REEF GLOBAL INC., VIA CERTIFIED MAIL, PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 415.40 AND 416.10

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

9/11/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Stipulation and Order (name extension) Stipulation and Order to Continue Defendants' Response Date

9/11/2023: Stipulation and Order (name extension) Stipulation and Order to Continue Defendants' Response Date

Proof of Service by Mail

9/6/2023: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

9/6/2023: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

8/23/2023: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

8/22/2023: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

8/22/2023: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Personal Service

8/16/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/16/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/16/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/16/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/16/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/16/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/16/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/15/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

8/7/2023: Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

8/7/2023: First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

12/05/2023

Hearing12/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 78 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023

DocketNotice OF FILING OF PROOF OF SERVICE SERVING REEF GLOBAL INC., VIA CERTIFIED MAIL, PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 415.40 AND 416.10; Filed by: JASMYNE HESTER (Plaintiff); As to: BAMIA 2 LLC (Defendant); REEF GLOBAL, Inc. (Defendant); REEF GLOBAL HOLDINGS, INC. (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023

DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: BAMIA 2 LLC (Defendant); REEF GLOBAL, Inc. (Defendant); REEF GLOBAL HOLDINGS, INC. (Defendant); REEF TECHNOLOGY, INC. (Defendant); REEF PARKING ENTERPRISES, LLC (Defendant); REEF GLOBAL, LLC (Defendant); THE WENDYS COMPANY (Defendant); WENDYS INTERNATIONAL, INC. (Defendant); WENDYS INTERNATIONAL, LLC (Defendant); As to: JASMYNE HESTER (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023

DocketStipulation and Order to Continue Defendants' Response Date; Signed and Filed by: BAMIA 2 LLC (Defendant); REEF GLOBAL, Inc. (Defendant); REEF GLOBAL HOLDINGS, INC. (Defendant); REEF TECHNOLOGY, INC. (Defendant); REEF PARKING ENTERPRISES, LLC (Defendant); REEF GLOBAL, LLC (Defendant); THE WENDYS COMPANY (Defendant); WENDYS INTERNATIONAL, INC. (Defendant); WENDYS INTERNATIONAL, LLC (Defendant); As to: JASMYNE HESTER (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023

DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: JASMYNE HESTER (Plaintiff); As to: BAMIA 2 LLC (Defendant); REEF GLOBAL, Inc. (Defendant); REEF GLOBAL HOLDINGS, INC. (Defendant) et al. After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023

DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: JASMYNE HESTER (Plaintiff); As to: BAMIA 2 LLC (Defendant); REEF GLOBAL, Inc. (Defendant); REEF GLOBAL HOLDINGS, INC. (Defendant) et al. After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023

DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: JASMYNE HESTER (Plaintiff); As to: BAMIA 2 LLC (Defendant); REEF GLOBAL, Inc. (Defendant); REEF GLOBAL HOLDINGS, INC. (Defendant) et al. After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023

DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: JASMYNE HESTER (Plaintiff); As to: BAMIA 2 LLC (Defendant); REEF GLOBAL, Inc. (Defendant); REEF GLOBAL HOLDINGS, INC. (Defendant) et al. After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023

DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: JASMYNE HESTER (Plaintiff); As to: BAMIA 2 LLC (Defendant); REEF GLOBAL, Inc. (Defendant); REEF GLOBAL HOLDINGS, INC. (Defendant) et al. After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023

DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: JASMYNE HESTER (Plaintiff); As to: BAMIA 2 LLC (Defendant); REEF GLOBAL, Inc. (Defendant); REEF GLOBAL HOLDINGS, INC. (Defendant) et al. Service Cost Waived: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
08/15/2023

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 12/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 78

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jill Feeney in Department 78 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: JASMYNE HESTER (Plaintiff); As to: BAMIA 2 LLC (Defendant); REEF GLOBAL, Inc. (Defendant); REEF GLOBAL HOLDINGS, INC. (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: JASMYNE HESTER (Plaintiff); As to: BAMIA 2 LLC (Defendant); REEF GLOBAL, Inc. (Defendant); REEF GLOBAL HOLDINGS, INC. (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: JASMYNE HESTER (Plaintiff); As to: BAMIA 2 LLC (Defendant); REEF GLOBAL, Inc. (Defendant); REEF GLOBAL HOLDINGS, INC. (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less